EP1269964 - Hydraulic massager device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, FR | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states I.M.P.A. F.LLI Togno S.r.l. Via Tamlone, 1/A, Fraz. Arzo 28881 Casale Conte Cerro (Verbania) / IT | [2005/35] |
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states I.M.P.A. F.LLI Togno S.r.l. Via Tamlone, 1/A, Fraz. Arzo 28881 Casale Conte Cerro (Verbania) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Togno, Franco, c/o I.M.P.A. F.Lli Togno S.r.l. Via Tamlone, 1/A - Fraz. Arzo 28881 Casale Conte Cerro (Verbania) / IT | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Botti, Mario Botti & Ferrari S.p.A. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Botti, Mario Botti & Ferrari S.r.l., Via Locatelli, 5 20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 01830439.4 | 28.06.2001 | [2003/01] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1269964 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1269964 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61H23/04, A61H23/02 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
A61H23/0263 (EP,US);
A61H23/04 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1238 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/01] | Title | German: | Hydraulische Massagevorrichtung | [2003/01] | English: | Hydraulic massager device | [2003/01] | French: | Dispositif de massage hydraulique | [2003/01] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/35] | 29.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.08.2005 | BE | 31.08.2005 | CH | 31.08.2005 | CY | 31.08.2005 | FI | 31.08.2005 | FR | 31.08.2005 | LI | 31.08.2005 | NL | 31.08.2005 | TR | 31.08.2005 | DK | 30.11.2005 | GR | 30.11.2005 | SE | 30.11.2005 | ES | 12.12.2005 | PT | 22.02.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 31.08.2005 | |
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
NL | 31.08.2005 | ||
TR | 31.08.2005 | ||
DK | 30.11.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
ES | 12.12.2005 | ||
PT | 22.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 31.08.2005 | |
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
NL | 31.08.2005 | ||
DK | 30.11.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
ES | 12.12.2005 | ||
PT | 22.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 31.08.2005 | |
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
NL | 31.08.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
ES | 12.12.2005 | ||
PT | 22.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 31.08.2005 | |
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
NL | 31.08.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
ES | 12.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 31.08.2005 | |
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
ES | 12.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 31.08.2005 | |
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2905171 (DE CRESCENZO ANTHONY) [A] 1,6 * the whole document *; | [Y]US3968789 (SIMONCINI GIANCARLO) [Y] 7,8 * column 2, line 50 - line 60 *; | [A]US4228558 (ZHADANOV SEMEN) [A] 5* figure 3 *; | [Y]US4432355 (DELLUC RENE [FR]) [Y] 7-9 * column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 35; figures 1,2 *; | [XY]US4709691 (LEMONS DAVID H [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 53; figures 1,2 * [Y] 7-9; | [A]US5385532 (SHYU CHIH-YES [TW]) [A] 1,2,6,9 * column 1, line 63 - column 3, line 5; figures 1-5 *; | [XY]US5467927 (LEE MAN H [HK]) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 7 - line 62 * * column 3, line 41 - line 46; figures 1,2 * [Y] 7-9 |