EP1320167 - Current-sharing modular supply method and circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.03.2005 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2005 [2005/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAGNETEK S.p.A. Via S. Giorgio 642 52028 Terranuova Bracciolini (Arezzo) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/25] | For all designated states Magnetek S.p.A. Via S. Giorgio 642 52028 Terranuova Bracciolini (Arezzo) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Canova, Antonio via Po 79/4 52025 Montevarchi, Arezzo / IT | 02 /
Kim, Minho via Taglieschi 15/A 52031 Anghiari, Arezzo / IT | [2003/25] | Representative(s) | Mannucci, Michele, et al Ufficio Tecnico Ing.A. Mannucci Via della Scala 4 50123 Firenze / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/25] | Mannucci, Michele, et al Ufficio Tecnico Ing.A. Mannucci, Via della Scala 4 50123 Firenze / IT | Application number, filing date | 01830762.9 | 13.12.2001 | [2003/25] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1320167 | Date: | 18.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H02J1/10 | [2003/25] | CPC: |
H02J1/102 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/25] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Schaltung zur Stromaufteilung einer modularen Stromversorgung | [2003/25] | English: | Current-sharing modular supply method and circuit | [2003/25] | French: | Procédé et circuit de partage de courant pour une alimentation modulaire | [2003/25] | Examination procedure | 24.09.2002 | Examination requested [2003/25] | 11.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/17] | 23.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5521809 (ASHLEY DONALD J [US], et al) [Y] 1,5-8,13,15,17,20 * abstract * * figures 2,3 * * column 3, line 8 - column 8, line 7 *; | [A]US6009000 (SIRI KASEMSAN [US]) [A] 1-22 * abstract * * figure - *; | [A]US6134129 (KELLER STEVEN J [US]) [A] 1-22* the whole document *; | [Y]EP1061629 (ST MICROELECTRONICS SRL [IT]) [Y] 1,5-8,13,15,17,20 * the whole document *; | [A]US6262901 (SIMOPOULOS ANASTASTIOS V [US]) [A] 1-22 * the whole document * | Examination | US4066960 | US5202682 | US5497332 | DE19910755 | EP1148609 | - NATIONAL SEMICONDUCTOR, "LM3822 PRECISION CURRENT GAUGE IC WITH INTERNAL ZERO OHM SENSE ELEMENT AND PWM OUTPUT", PRODUCT DATA SHEET, (200007), pages 1 - 12 |