EP1326209 - Method for contrast enhancement in colour digital image [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.08.2008 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | 01.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Srl Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/28] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Castorina, Alfio Via G. Pascoli, 35 95020 Linera (Catania) / IT | 02 /
Mancuso, Massimo Via Oriani, 19 20052 Monza (Milano) / IT | 03 /
Battiato, Sebastiano Via IV Novembre, 138/B 95022 Acicatena (Catania) / IT | [2007/39] |
Former [2003/28] | 01 /
Castorina, Alfio Via G. Pascoli, 35 95020 Linera (Catania) / IT | ||
02 /
Mancuso, Massimo Via Orania, 19 20052 Monza (Milano) / IT | |||
03 /
Battiato, Sebastiano Via IV Novembre, 138/B 95022 Acicatena (Catania) / IT | Representative(s) | Siniscalco, Fabio, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via della Quattro Fontane 15 00184 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/12] | Siniscalco, Fabio, et al JACOBACCI & PARTNERS S.p.A. Via delle Quattro Fontane, 15 00184 Roma / IT | ||
Former [2003/28] | Maggioni, Claudio, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A., Via delle Quattro Fontane 15 I-00184 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 01830803.1 | 24.12.2001 | [2003/28] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1326209 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1326209 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06T5/40 | [2003/28] | CPC: |
G06T5/94 (EP,US);
G06T5/40 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10024 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/14] |
Former [2003/28] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Kontrastverbesserung in digitalen Farbbildern | [2003/28] | English: | Method for contrast enhancement in colour digital image | [2003/28] | French: | Méthode d'amélioration du contraste d'images numériques en couleur | [2003/28] | Examination procedure | 30.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/10] | 10.01.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.05.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 12.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.02.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 27.12.2007 | [2008/36] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0801360 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]EP0877339 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]); | [A]US6049626 (KIM YEONG-TAEG [KR]); |