EP1130203 - A cassette and drawer intended for the construction of drawer cabinets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/36] | Cassette intended for the construction of drawer cabinets | ||
[2004/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2006 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, FR | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states System Edström Bilinredningar AB Stockholmsvägen 35 C 194 54 Upplands Väsby / SE | [2001/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hällsten, Lars Tornövägen 1 183 63 Täby / SE | [2001/36] | Representative(s) | Fröderberg, Anders Oskar BRANN AB P.O. Box 12246 102 26 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/46] | Fröderberg, Anders Oskar Dr Ludwig Brann Patentbyra AB, P.O. Box 171 92 104 62 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2001/36] | Johansson, Lars E. Lars Johansson Patentbyra AB P.O. Box 68 801 02 Gävle / SE | Application number, filing date | 01850026.4 | 05.02.2001 | [2001/36] | Priority number, date | SE20000000649 | 29.02.2000 Original published format: SE 0000649 | [2001/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1130203 | Date: | 05.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1130203 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | [2003/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1130203 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | E05B65/46, E05C1/10, E05B13/00, B60R11/06, B25H3/02 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
E05B65/46 (EP,US);
A47B2095/024 (EP,US);
E05C1/10 (EP,US);
E05C1/16 (EP,US);
Y10T292/0977 (EP,US);
Y10T292/0997 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/36] | E05B65/46, E05C1/10, E05B13/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/36] | Extension states | AL | 10.02.2001 | LT | 10.02.2001 | LV | 10.02.2001 | SI | 10.02.2001 | Title | German: | Kassetten und Schublade für Schubladenschränke | [2004/41] | English: | A cassette and drawer intended for the construction of drawer cabinets | [2004/41] | French: | Coffret et tiroir pour la construction d'armoires à tiroirs | [2004/42] |
Former [2001/36] | Kassetten für Schubladenschränke | ||
Former [2001/36] | Cassette intended for the construction of drawer cabinets | ||
Former [2001/36] | Coffret pour la construction d'armoires à tiroirs | Examination procedure | 30.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/35] | 01.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.05.2005 | BE | 25.05.2005 | CH | 25.05.2005 | CY | 25.05.2005 | FI | 25.05.2005 | FR | 25.05.2005 | IT | 25.05.2005 | LI | 25.05.2005 | TR | 25.05.2005 | DK | 25.08.2005 | GR | 25.08.2005 | SE | 25.08.2005 | ES | 05.09.2005 | PT | 27.10.2005 | IE | 06.02.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2007/36] | AT | 25.05.2005 | |
BE | 25.05.2005 | ||
CH | 25.05.2005 | ||
FI | 25.05.2005 | ||
IT | 25.05.2005 | ||
LI | 25.05.2005 | ||
TR | 25.05.2005 | ||
DK | 25.08.2005 | ||
GR | 25.08.2005 | ||
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
ES | 05.09.2005 | ||
PT | 27.10.2005 | ||
IE | 06.02.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 25.05.2005 | |
BE | 25.05.2005 | ||
CH | 25.05.2005 | ||
FI | 25.05.2005 | ||
LI | 25.05.2005 | ||
TR | 25.05.2005 | ||
DK | 25.08.2005 | ||
GR | 25.08.2005 | ||
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
ES | 05.09.2005 | ||
PT | 27.10.2005 | ||
IE | 06.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 25.05.2005 | |
BE | 25.05.2005 | ||
CH | 25.05.2005 | ||
FI | 25.05.2005 | ||
LI | 25.05.2005 | ||
TR | 25.05.2005 | ||
DK | 25.08.2005 | ||
GR | 25.08.2005 | ||
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
ES | 05.09.2005 | ||
PT | 27.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 25.05.2005 | |
BE | 25.05.2005 | ||
CH | 25.05.2005 | ||
FI | 25.05.2005 | ||
LI | 25.05.2005 | ||
DK | 25.08.2005 | ||
GR | 25.08.2005 | ||
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
ES | 05.09.2005 | ||
PT | 27.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 25.05.2005 | |
BE | 25.05.2005 | ||
FI | 25.05.2005 | ||
DK | 25.08.2005 | ||
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 25.05.2005 | |
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 25.08.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB866109 (VICKERS ARMSTRONGS LTD) [A] 1 * figure 2 *; | WO9513726 [ ] (BORGSTROEMS PLAATINDUSTRI AB [SE], et al) [ ] * page 3, line 36 - page 5, line 18 * * figures 4-7 *; | [DA]EP0739178 (BORGSTROEMS PLATINDUSTRI AB [SE]) [DA] 1; | [A]DE29817875U (RAMSAUER DIETER [DE]) [A] 1 * page 6, paragraph 8 - page 8, paragraph 1 ** figure 1 * | by applicant | EP0793178 |