EP1295564 - Adjustable radial artery compressor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RADI MEDICAL SYSTEMS AB Palmbladsgatan 10 754 50 Uppsala / SE | [2003/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Akerfeldt, Dan Nyvla SE-755 92 Uppsala / SE | [2003/13] | Representative(s) | Lindgren, Anders BRANN AB P.O. Box 12246 102 26 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/13] | Lindgren, Anders Dr. Ludwig Brann Patentbyra AB, P.O. Box 1344, Drottninggatan 7 751 43 Uppsala / SE | Application number, filing date | 01850162.7 | 20.09.2001 | [2003/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1295564 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1295564 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/132 | [2003/13] | CPC: |
A61B17/135 (EP,US);
A61B17/132 (EP,US);
A61B17/1325 (EP,US);
A61B17/1327 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/13] | Title | German: | Einstellbare Druckvorrichtung für die Arterie radialis | [2003/13] | English: | Adjustable radial artery compressor | [2003/13] | French: | Dispositif règlable de pression d'artère radiale | [2003/13] | Examination procedure | 11.06.2002 | Examination requested [2003/13] | 23.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 09.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 12.12.2005 | Appeal received No. T0301/06 | 10.02.2006 | Statement of grounds filed | 09.10.2008 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | 09.10.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.10.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 09.10.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | Opposition(s) | 23.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.05.2009 | BE | 20.05.2009 | CY | 20.05.2009 | DK | 20.05.2009 | FI | 20.05.2009 | NL | 20.05.2009 | TR | 20.05.2009 | GR | 21.08.2009 | IE | 20.09.2009 | LU | 20.09.2009 | PT | 20.09.2009 | CH | 30.09.2009 | LI | 30.09.2009 | MC | 30.09.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 20.05.2009 | |
BE | 20.05.2009 | ||
DK | 20.05.2009 | ||
FI | 20.05.2009 | ||
NL | 20.05.2009 | ||
GR | 21.08.2009 | ||
IE | 20.09.2009 | ||
LU | 20.09.2009 | ||
PT | 20.09.2009 | ||
CH | 30.09.2009 | ||
LI | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 20.05.2009 | |
BE | 20.05.2009 | ||
DK | 20.05.2009 | ||
FI | 20.05.2009 | ||
NL | 20.05.2009 | ||
GR | 21.08.2009 | ||
IE | 20.09.2009 | ||
PT | 20.09.2009 | ||
CH | 30.09.2009 | ||
LI | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 20.05.2009 | |
BE | 20.05.2009 | ||
DK | 20.05.2009 | ||
FI | 20.05.2009 | ||
NL | 20.05.2009 | ||
IE | 20.09.2009 | ||
PT | 20.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 20.05.2009 | |
BE | 20.05.2009 | ||
DK | 20.05.2009 | ||
FI | 20.05.2009 | ||
NL | 20.05.2009 | ||
PT | 20.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 20.05.2009 | |
BE | 20.05.2009 | ||
DK | 20.05.2009 | ||
FI | 20.05.2009 | ||
NL | 20.05.2009 | ||
PT | 20.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 20.05.2009 | |
DK | 20.05.2009 | ||
FI | 20.05.2009 | ||
NL | 20.05.2009 | ||
PT | 20.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 20.05.2009 | |
FI | 20.05.2009 | ||
NL | 20.05.2009 | ||
PT | 20.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 20.05.2009 | |
FI | 20.05.2009 | ||
PT | 20.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE219012 (A. VON BOROSINI) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [XY]DE258945 (R. HERRMANN) [X] 1,2,11,12 * the whole document * [Y] 4,13,14; | [A]US37156 (J. DUNTON) [A] * page 1, line 61 - line 76; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]EP0462088 (RADI MEDICAL SYSTEMS [SE]) [Y] 4,13,14 * column 3, line 2 - line 28 * * column 4, line 26 - line 43; figures 1-3 *; | [XY]US5569297 (MAKOWER JOSHUA [US], et al) [X] 1,2,11,12 * column 4, line 12 - column 5, line 23; figures 1-3 * [Y] 4,13,14 |