EP1216679 - Method of producing a laminate of fibrous material, laminate produced according to the method and an absorbent article containing said laminate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.08.2004 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.2004 [2004/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCA Hygiene Products AB 405 03 Göteborg / SE | [2002/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Almberg, Christian Grönstensvägen 15 435 41 Mölnlycke / SE | 02 /
Kusibojoska, Liljana Malmögatan 4D 252 49 Helsingborg / SE | 03 /
Barne, Olle Lilla Skogsrydsgatan 16 426 74 Västra Frölunda / SE | 04 /
Carlbark, Olle Verkmästeregatan 1 417 57 Göteborg / SE | 05 /
Rönnberg, Peter Rävekärrsgatan 265 431 33 Mölndal / SE | [2002/26] | Representative(s) | Egeröd, Lisbeth, et al Valea AB Box 1098 405 23 Gothenburg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/26] | Egeröd, Lisbeth, et al Ström & Gulliksson IP AB Sjöporten 4 417 64 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 01850206.2 | 07.12.2001 | [2002/26] | Priority number, date | SE20000047621 | 20.12.2000 Original published format: SE 0047621 | [2002/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1216679 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1216679 | Date: | 30.10.2002 | [2002/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/72, A61F13/496, B32B5/26, D04H13/00 | [2002/26] | CPC: |
D04H1/555 (EP);
A61F13/15699 (EP);
A61F13/5622 (EP);
A61F13/64 (EP);
D04H1/559 (EP);
D04H1/593 (EP);
D04H13/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Mehrschichtfaserwerkstoffes, Mehrschichtfaserwerkstoff dadurch hergestellt, und saugfähiger enthaltender Artikel | [2002/26] | English: | Method of producing a laminate of fibrous material, laminate produced according to the method and an absorbent article containing said laminate | [2002/26] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un stratifié fibreux, stratifié fabriqué à partir de la méthode et produit absorbant contenant le dit stratifié | [2002/26] | Examination procedure | 25.04.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/26] | 30.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/40] | 23.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/40] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5470640 (MODRAK JAMES P [US]) [X] 1-3,6-18 * column 3, line 59 - column 4, line 36; figure 1 *; | [X]WO0038911 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [X] 1-3,6-19 * page 7, line 30 - page 9, line 12; figures 1,4 * * page 19, line 29 - page 21, line 14 *; | [X]US5326612 (GOULAIT DAVID J K [US]) [X] 1-3,6-19 * column 12, line 50 - column 14, line 68; figure 11 *; | [X]WO9914045 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [X] 1-3,6-19 * page 15, line 20 - page 16, line 10 * * page 19, line 2 - line 20; figures 1,3-5 *; | [X]WO0031342 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1 * figures 1,2,5 * |