EP1195801 - Process for plasma treating an isolation layer with low permittivity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.2015 [2015/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMEC Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95054-3299 / US | [2014/05] |
Former [2009/33] | For all designated states IMEC Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | ||
For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95054-3299 / US | |||
Former [2002/15] | For all designated states Interuniversitair Micro-Elektronica Centrum Vereniging Zonder Winstbejag, Kapeldreef 75 3001 Heverlee / BE | ||
For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95054-3299 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baklanov, Michael R. Vandervaerenlaan 16/8 3000 Leuven / BE | 02 /
Vanhaelemeersch, Serge Vijfbunderstraat 9 3001 Leuven / BE | 03 /
Maex, Karen A. Rulenslaan 31 3020 Herent / BE | 04 /
Donaton, Ricardo Leeuwerikenstraat 39/44 3001 Heverlee / BE | 05 /
Schaekers, Marc Leeuwerikenstraat 53/73 3001 Heverlee / BE | 06 /
Struyf, Herbert Schorpioenstraat 34 2018 Antwerpen / BE | [2002/15] | Representative(s) | Van Malderen, Joëlle, et al pronovem - Office Van Malderen Avenue Josse Goffin 158 1082 Bruxelles / BE | [2014/05] |
Former [2002/15] | Van Malderen, Joelle, et al Office Van Malderen, Place Reine Fabiola 6/1 1083 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 01870205.0 | 28.09.2001 | [2002/15] | Priority number, date | US20000236569 | 29.09.2000 Original published format: US 236569 | [2002/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1195801 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1195801 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | [2009/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1195801 | Date: | 29.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/321, H01L21/768, H01L21/316, H01L23/532 | [2002/15] | CPC: |
H01L21/31116 (EP);
H01L21/02203 (EP,US);
H01L21/02126 (EP,US);
H01L21/02167 (EP,US);
H01L21/0234 (US);
H01L21/76802 (EP);
H01L21/76826 (EP);
H01L21/76831 (EP);
H01L21/02216 (EP,US);
H01L21/02274 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/06] |
Former [2002/15] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Behandlung einer Isolierschicht mit niedriger Dielektrizitätskonstante | [2002/15] | English: | Process for plasma treating an isolation layer with low permittivity | [2002/15] | French: | Procédé de traitement par plasma d'une couche isolante à constante diélectrique faible | [2002/15] | Examination procedure | 23.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/01] | 04.12.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.01.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 25.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.02.2010 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 21.06.2010 | Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art | 30.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 30.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0010199 (LAM RES CORP [US]) [X] 1-9 * claim - *; | [X]EP1030353 (FRANCE TELECOM [FR]) [X] 1-9 * claim - *; | [X] - DELSOL R ET AL, "Transformer coupled plasma dielectric etch for 0.25 mum technologies", MICROELECTRONIC ENGINEERING, ELSEVIER PUBLISHERS BV., AMSTERDAM, NL, (20000101), vol. 50, no. 1-4, ISSN 0167-9317, pages 75 - 80, XP004237653 [X] 1-9 * page 78, section "5. Low k dielectric etching" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-9317(99)00267-1 | [X] - BAKLANOV M R ET AL, "Process integration induced thermodesorption from SiO2/SiLK resin dielectric based interconnects", JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY B: MICROELECTRONICSPROCESSING AND PHENOMENA, AMERICAN VACUUM SOCIETY, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19990901), vol. 17, no. 5, ISSN 0734-211X, pages 2136 - 2146, XP012007707 [X] 1-9 * page 2142, column R, paragraph LAST * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1116/1.590883 | [X] - THOMPSON ET AL., "Etch process Development for FLARE for Dual Damascene Architecture using a N2/O2 plasma", PROC. OF THE IEEE 1999 INT. INTERCONNECT TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, Piscataway, USA, (19990524), pages 59 - 61, XP002524587 [X] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IITC.1999.787078 | Examination | - DONATON ET AL, "Critical issues in the integration of copper and low-k dielectrics", IEEE INT. INTERCONNECT TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, vol. 99, pages 262 - 264 |