EP1126308 - Hinge between a side-piece and an end-piece of a spectacle frame [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.09.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.10.2006 [2006/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Simon Redtenbacher seel. Ww & Söhne GmbH & Co. KG Redtenbachstrasse 7 4644 Scharnstein / AT | [2001/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buchegger, Harald 4817 St. Konrad 78 / AT | [2001/34] | Representative(s) | Hübscher, Helmut, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Hübscher Postfach 411 4010 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/34] | Hübscher, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing., et al Spittelwiese 7 4020 Linz / AT | Application number, filing date | 01890033.2 | 12.02.2001 | [2001/34] | Priority number, date | AT20000000218 | 14.02.2000 Original published format: AT 2182000 | [2001/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1126308 | Date: | 22.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G02C5/22 | [2001/34] | CPC: |
G02C5/2209 (EP);
G02C5/22 (KR);
G02C2200/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/21] |
Former [2001/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Scharniergelenk zwischen einem Bügel und einem Bügelbacken einer Brille | [2001/34] | English: | Hinge between a side-piece and an end-piece of a spectacle frame | [2001/34] | French: | Charnière entre une branche et un tenon d'une monture de lunettes | [2001/34] | Examination procedure | 05.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/16] | 09.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/41] | 19.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0945751 (CHARMANT CO LTD [JP], et al) [DA] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]EP0926530 (YUGEN KAISHA MONA JAPAN CORP [JP]) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]US4527291 (NUSSBICKL WALTER [DE]) [A] 1,3 * column 3, line 11 - line 48 *; | [A]DE19504297 (PROKSCH WOLFGANG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE29809704U (STEINWACHS PETER [DE]) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [A]FR2658231 (PIARD GERARD [FR]) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [A]US1504212 (CARLSON CHARLES O) [A] 1 * page 2, line 12 - line 46 * |