EP1339926 - CONCRETE FORMWORK WALL SERVING ALSO AS REINFORCEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.2010 [2010/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coffor Internacional Exploracao de Patentes Lda Rua dos Murcas 88, PO Box 7 9000 Funchal Madeira / PT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/36] | For all designated states Coffor Internacional Exploracao de Patentes Lda Rua dos Murcas 88, PO Box 7, Madeira 9000 Funcal / PT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MESSIQUA, Pierre Les Champs Penys 1 CH-1295 Mies / CH | [2003/36] | Representative(s) | Wenger, Joel-Théophile Leman Consulting S.A. Chemin de Précossy 31 1260 Nyon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2003/36] | Wenger, Joel-Théophile Leman Consulting S.A. 62 route de Clementy 1260 Nyon / CH | Application number, filing date | 01900006.6 | 10.01.2001 | [2003/36] | WO2001IB00017 | Priority number, date | EP20000124716 | 13.11.2000 Original published format: EP 00124716 | [2003/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0238878 | Date: | 16.05.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1339926 | Date: | 03.09.2003 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | E04B2/86 | [2003/36] | CPC: |
E04B2/8635 (EP,US);
E04B2/86 (KR);
E04B2/8658 (EP,US);
E04B2002/8694 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/36] | Extension states | AL | 23.05.2003 | LT | 23.05.2003 | LV | 23.05.2003 | MK | 23.05.2003 | RO | 23.05.2003 | SI | 23.05.2003 | Title | German: | SCHALUNG FÜR EINE BETONWAND DIE AUCH ALS BEWEHRUNG WIRKT | [2003/36] | English: | CONCRETE FORMWORK WALL SERVING ALSO AS REINFORCEMENT | [2003/36] | French: | MUR EN BETON AVEC COFFRAGE SERVANT AUSSI D'ARMATURE | [2003/36] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/36] | 30.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/39] | 17.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2010 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]FR2437473 (GROSJEAN CLAUDE) [Y] 7 * page 1, line 1 - line 3 * * page 2, line 10 - line 21; figure 2 * [A] 1; | [XY]EP0055504 (NAGRON STEEL & ALUMINIUM [NL]) [X] 1-3,5,6,10-12 * the whole document * [Y] 7-9; | [DYA]WO9731165 (TECHNOPARK LIMITED [IE], et al) [DY] 8,9 * page 1, line 2 - line 8 * * page 8, line 13 - line 31; figures 1-6 * [A] 1; | [A]US5687522 (DURAND PHILIPPE [FR], et al) [A] 1,13,16,18 * column 1, line 5 - line 12 * * column 2, line 39 - column 5, line 4 ** column 6, line 1 - line 37; figures 1,2 * |