EP1350763 - SAPO-11 MOLECULAR SIEVE, ITS SYNTHETIC METHOD AND A CATALYST CONTAINING THE MOLECULAR SIEVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states China Petroleum & Chemical Corporation 6A, Huixin Dong Street, Chaoyang District Beijing 100029 / CN | For all designated states RESEARCH INSTITUTE OF PETROLEUM PROCESSING, SINOPEC 18 Xue Yuan Road Haidian District Beijing 100083 / CN | [2008/31] |
Former [2003/41] | For all designated states China Petroleum & Chemical Corporation 6A, Huixin Dong Street, Chaoyang District Beijing 100029 / CN | ||
For all designated states RESEARCH INSTITUTE OF PETROLEUM PROCESSING, SINOPEC 18 Xue Yuan Road Haidian District Beijing 100083 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Fengmei 18 Xueyuan Road, Hadian District Beijing 100083 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Yueming 18 Xueyuan Road, Hadian District Beijing 100083 / CN | 03 /
SHU, Xingtian 18 Xueyuan Road, Hadian District Beijing 100083 / CN | 04 /
WANG, Weidong 18 Xueyuan Road, Hadian District Beijing 100083 / CN | 05 /
QIN, Fengming 18 Xueyuan Road, Hadian District Beijing 100083 / CN | [2003/41] | Representative(s) | Muschke, Markus Artur Heinz Schwabe, Sandmair, Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/41] | Muschke, Markus, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Schwabe, Dr.Dr. Sandmair, Dr. Marx, Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01900094.2 | 05.01.2001 | [2003/41] | WO2001CN00010 | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02053499 | Date: | 11.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1350763 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1350763 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 14.11.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B01J29/85, C01B39/54, C10G45/62 | [2005/02] | CPC: |
C01B37/08 (EP,US);
B01J29/85 (EP,US);
C10G45/64 (EP,US);
B01J37/0009 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/41] | C01B39/54, B01J29/85, C10G47/18 | Designated contracting states | FR, GB, NL [2004/22] |
Former [2003/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SAPO-11 MOLEKULARSIEB : SEIN SYNTHESEVERFAHREN UND KATALYSATOR DAS MOLEKULARSIEB ENTHALTEND | [2003/41] | English: | SAPO-11 MOLECULAR SIEVE, ITS SYNTHETIC METHOD AND A CATALYST CONTAINING THE MOLECULAR SIEVE | [2003/41] | French: | TAMIS MOLECULAIRE SAPO-11, PROCEDE DE SYNTHESE ET CATALYSEUR CONTENANT LE TAMIS MOLECULAIRE | [2003/41] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2002 | Translation filed | 23.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2002 | Search fee paid | 23.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2002 | Examination requested [2003/41] | 23.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4859312 (MILLER STEPHEN J [US]) [X] 1-27 * column 5, lines 8-11; tables I,II *; | [DX]US4440871 (LOK BRENT M [US], et al) [DX] 1-27 * column 27, lines 11-14; examples 15-22; tables F,J,III,IV * | International search | [A]CN88100080 ; | [A]US4710485 (MILLER STEPHEN J [US]); | [A]EP0103117 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]); | [A]EP0391774 (ELF FRANCE [FR]); | [A]US5208005 (MILLER STEPHEN J [US]); | [A]WO9961559 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]) |