EP1249094 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR A SELECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGEMENT SCHEME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2002/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARANTAINEN, Janne Franzeninkatu 5 C 75 FIN-00500 Helsinki / FI | 02 /
FORSSELL, Mika Bertel Jungin Aukio 4 C 40 FIN-02600 Espoo / FI | [2002/42] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/33] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/42] | Böckelen, Rainer Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01900211.2 | 11.01.2001 | [2002/42] | WO2001IB00022 | Priority number, date | US20000489262 | 21.01.2000 Original published format: US 489262 | [2002/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0154338 | Date: | 26.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1249094 | Date: | 16.10.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1249094 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/18, H04L1/16 | [2002/42] | CPC: |
H04L67/06 (EP,US);
H04L1/16 (KR);
H04L1/1685 (EP,US);
H04L1/1809 (EP,US);
H04L1/1877 (EP,US);
H04L1/188 (EP,US);
H04L69/164 (EP,US);
H04L69/22 (EP,US);
H04W80/06 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR SELEKTIVEN DATENEMPFANGSQUITTIERUNG | [2002/42] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR A SELECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGEMENT SCHEME | [2002/42] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR MECANISME D'EMISSION SELECTIVE D'UN ACCUSE DE RECEPTION | [2002/42] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/42] | 23.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 21.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06123751.7 / EP1808975 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/43] | Request for further processing for: | 21.09.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 21.09.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.10.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   14.07.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.11.2006 | BE | 15.11.2006 | CH | 15.11.2006 | CY | 15.11.2006 | FI | 15.11.2006 | FR | 15.11.2006 | IT | 15.11.2006 | LI | 15.11.2006 | NL | 15.11.2006 | TR | 15.11.2006 | IE | 11.01.2007 | LU | 11.01.2007 | MC | 31.01.2007 | DK | 15.02.2007 | GB | 15.02.2007 | SE | 15.02.2007 | DE | 16.02.2007 | GR | 16.02.2007 | ES | 26.02.2007 | PT | 16.04.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 15.11.2006 | |
BE | 15.11.2006 | ||
CH | 15.11.2006 | ||
CY | 15.11.2006 | ||
FI | 15.11.2006 | ||
FR | 15.11.2006 | ||
IT | 15.11.2006 | ||
LI | 15.11.2006 | ||
NL | 15.11.2006 | ||
IE | 11.01.2007 | ||
LU | 11.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
DK | 15.02.2007 | ||
GB | 15.02.2007 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | ||
DE | 16.02.2007 | ||
GR | 16.02.2007 | ||
ES | 26.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/52] | AT | 15.11.2006 | |
BE | 15.11.2006 | ||
CH | 15.11.2006 | ||
FI | 15.11.2006 | ||
FR | 15.11.2006 | ||
IT | 15.11.2006 | ||
LI | 15.11.2006 | ||
NL | 15.11.2006 | ||
IE | 11.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
DK | 15.02.2007 | ||
GB | 15.02.2007 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | ||
DE | 16.02.2007 | ||
GR | 16.02.2007 | ||
ES | 26.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 15.11.2006 | |
BE | 15.11.2006 | ||
CH | 15.11.2006 | ||
FI | 15.11.2006 | ||
IT | 15.11.2006 | ||
LI | 15.11.2006 | ||
NL | 15.11.2006 | ||
IE | 11.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
DK | 15.02.2007 | ||
GB | 15.02.2007 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | ||
DE | 16.02.2007 | ||
GR | 16.02.2007 | ||
ES | 26.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.04.2007 | ||
FR | 29.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 15.11.2006 | |
BE | 15.11.2006 | ||
CH | 15.11.2006 | ||
FI | 15.11.2006 | ||
IT | 15.11.2006 | ||
LI | 15.11.2006 | ||
NL | 15.11.2006 | ||
IE | 11.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
DK | 15.02.2007 | ||
GB | 15.02.2007 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | ||
DE | 16.02.2007 | ||
GR | 16.02.2007 | ||
ES | 26.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 15.11.2006 | |
BE | 15.11.2006 | ||
CH | 15.11.2006 | ||
FI | 15.11.2006 | ||
IT | 15.11.2006 | ||
LI | 15.11.2006 | ||
NL | 15.11.2006 | ||
IE | 11.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
DK | 15.02.2007 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | ||
DE | 16.02.2007 | ||
ES | 26.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | AT | 15.11.2006 | |
BE | 15.11.2006 | ||
CH | 15.11.2006 | ||
FI | 15.11.2006 | ||
IT | 15.11.2006 | ||
LI | 15.11.2006 | ||
NL | 15.11.2006 | ||
DK | 15.02.2007 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | ||
ES | 26.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 15.11.2006 | |
BE | 15.11.2006 | ||
CH | 15.11.2006 | ||
FI | 15.11.2006 | ||
IT | 15.11.2006 | ||
LI | 15.11.2006 | ||
NL | 15.11.2006 | ||
DK | 15.02.2007 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | AT | 15.11.2006 | |
BE | 15.11.2006 | ||
CH | 15.11.2006 | ||
FI | 15.11.2006 | ||
IT | 15.11.2006 | ||
LI | 15.11.2006 | ||
NL | 15.11.2006 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 15.11.2006 | |
BE | 15.11.2006 | ||
CH | 15.11.2006 | ||
FI | 15.11.2006 | ||
LI | 15.11.2006 | ||
NL | 15.11.2006 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 15.11.2006 | |
FI | 15.11.2006 | ||
NL | 15.11.2006 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 15.11.2006 | |
SE | 15.02.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0735701 (AT & T CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,6,12,14-18,20,22,23,26,28-32 * column 7, line 34 - column 8, line 10 * * column 10, line 25 - line 43 * * column 10, line 54 - column 11, line 9 * * column 11, line 25 - column 11, line 49 * * figures 4A,5A-5C *; | [A]US5970063 (CHAPMAN RANDY G [CA], et al) [A] 1,20* column 5, line 30 - line 65; figure 6 *; | [XA]EP0973302 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-3,6,12,14-17,20,22,23,26,28-31 * column 4, line 50 - column 5, line 42 * * column 6, line 15 - column 7, line 44 * * column 16, line 23 - line 34 * [A] 4-11,24,25 |