EP1246575 - LIQUID JET-POWERED SURGICAL INSTRUMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HydroCision, Inc. 267 Boston Road, Suite 28 N. Billerica, MA 01862 / US | [2009/28] |
Former [2007/43] | For all designated states HydroCision, Inc. 22 Linnell Circle Suite 102 Billerica, MA 01821 / US | ||
Former [2002/41] | For all designated states HydroCision, Inc. 100 Burtt Road, Suite G01 Andover, MA 01810 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOUTAFIS, Timothy, E. 4 Tucker Street Gloucester, MA 01930 / US | 02 /
FREEMAN, Donald, C., Jr. 23 Arborwood Drive Burlington, MA 01803 / US | 03 /
STAID, Kevin 20 Boylston Street Lowell, MA 01852 / US | [2005/39] |
Former [2002/41] | 01 /
MOUTAFIS, Timothy, E. 4 Tucker Street Gloucester, MA 01930 / US | ||
02 /
FREEMAN, Donald, C., Jr. 23 Arborwood Drive Burlington, MA 01803 / US | |||
03 /
STAID, Kevin 51 Berwick Street Lowell, MA 01852 / US | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/41] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01900985.1 | 10.01.2001 | [2002/41] | WO2001US00785 | Priority number, date | US20000480500 | 10.01.2000 Original published format: US 480500 | [2002/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0150966 | Date: | 19.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1246575 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1246575 | Date: | 08.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/22 | [2002/41] | CPC: |
A61B17/320758 (EP,US);
A61B17/3203 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00553 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHIRURGISCHES GERÄT, DAS DURCH FLÜSSIGKEIT-STRAHL BETRIEBEN IST | [2002/41] | English: | LIQUID JET-POWERED SURGICAL INSTRUMENTS | [2002/41] | French: | INSTRUMENTS CHIRURGICAUX A JET DE LIQUIDE | [2002/41] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.07.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/41] | 29.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2004 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   24.05.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.07.2009 | BE | 08.07.2009 | CY | 08.07.2009 | DK | 08.07.2009 | FI | 08.07.2009 | NL | 08.07.2009 | SE | 08.07.2009 | TR | 08.07.2009 | GR | 09.10.2009 | ES | 19.10.2009 | PT | 09.11.2009 | IE | 10.01.2010 | LU | 10.01.2010 | CH | 31.01.2010 | LI | 31.01.2010 | MC | 31.01.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
BE | 08.07.2009 | ||
CY | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
GR | 09.10.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
IE | 10.01.2010 | ||
LU | 10.01.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
BE | 08.07.2009 | ||
CY | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
GR | 09.10.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
IE | 10.01.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
BE | 08.07.2009 | ||
CY | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
GR | 09.10.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
IE | 10.01.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
BE | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
GR | 09.10.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
IE | 10.01.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
BE | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
GR | 09.10.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/37] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
BE | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
BE | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
ES | 19.10.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB199057 (FREDERICK JAMES PAYNE, et al) [X] 89,91-97,102,103,107,108 * page 1, line 63 - page 2, line 5; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US4267862 (NEFF JAMES A, et al) [X] 89,91-97,103,107,108 * column 4, line 55 - column 6, line 32; figures 3,6,6A,9 *; | [A]DE3320076 (SCHUBERT WERNER) [A] 1,2,4,6,8,9,11-14,16,17,19-21 * page 9, paragraph 2 - page 16, paragraph 2; figures 1-8 *; | [X]US5626072 (MIRAND MAURICIO [US], et al) [X] 89,91-97,102,103,107,109 * column 9, line 21 - column 10, line 26; figures 3-5 *; | [A]US5711151 (ENGFER ORTWIN [DE]) [A] 89-117* column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 65; figure 4 *; | [A]US5899915 (SAADAT VAHID [US]) [A] 1-6,8,9,11-17,20-22,24 * column 5, line 8 - column 6, line 55; figures 1,2,15E,15F * * column 13, line 50 - column 14, line 29 *; | [A]DE19734890 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1-4,11-16,19,21 * column 6, line 1 - column 7, line 64; figures 1-7 * | by applicant | US4631052 | US4690140 | US5254117 | US5429596 | US5527331 | WO9724074 | US5803733 | US5941876 |