EP1250678 - A METHOD OF ANALYZING A PLURALITY OF OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.02.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.03.2004 [2004/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Idac Soren Nymarksvej 8 8270 Hojbjerg / DK | [2002/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THOMSEN, Knud Samsögade 83 DK-8000 Aarhus / DK | 02 /
MIKKELSEN, Peter Rosensgade 99 DK-8300 Odder / DK | 03 /
LOCHT, Peter Magnoliavej 13 DK-8260 Viby J. / DK | [2002/48] |
Former [2002/43] | 01 /
THOMSEN, Knud Sams gade 83 DK-8300 Odder / DK | ||
02 /
MIKKELSEN, Peter Rosensgade 99 DK-8300 Odder / DK | |||
03 /
LOCHT, Peter Magnoliavej 13 DK-8260 Viby J. / DK | Representative(s) | Larsen, Hans Ole, et al LARSEN & BIRKEHOLM A/S Skandinavisk Patentbureau Banegårdspladsen 1 1570 Copenhagen V / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2002/43] | Larsen, Hans Ole, et al Larsen & Birkeholm A/S Skandinavisk Patentbureau Banegaardspladsen 1 P.O. Box 362 1570 Copenhagen V / DK | Application number, filing date | 01901120.4 | 15.01.2001 | [2002/43] | WO2001DK00022 | Priority number, date | DK20000000036 | 13.01.2000 Original published format: DK 200000036 | [2002/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0152176 | Date: | 19.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1250678 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00 | [2002/43] | CPC: |
G06F18/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ANALYSIEREN MEHRERER GEGENSTÄNDE | [2002/43] | English: | A METHOD OF ANALYZING A PLURALITY OF OBJECTS | [2002/43] | French: | PROCEDE D'ANALYSE DE DIVERS OBJETS | [2002/43] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.06.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/46] | 22.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/13] | 22.10.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5253302 (MASSEN ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-12; | [A]EP0574831 (KEY TECHNOLOGY INC [US])[A] 1-12; | [X]DK172429B (THOMSEN KNUD [DK], et al) [X] 1-12 |