EP1252328 - Method and means for isolating microorganisms [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/44] | CELL ISOLATION METHOD | ||
[2006/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states (deleted) ... | [2007/46] |
Former [2006/40] | For all designated states Genpoint AS Kjelsåsveien 174 0884 Oslo / NO | ||
Former [2002/44] | For all designated states Genpoint AS Gaustadalléen 21, Oslo Research Park 0349 Oslo / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REFSETH, Unn, Hilde Genpoint AS, Kjelsasveien 174 N-0884 Oslo / NO | 02 /
KOLPUS, Tone Genpoint AS, Kjelsasveien 174 N-0884 Oslo / NO | [2006/41] |
Former [2002/44] | 01 /
REFSETH, Unn, Hilde, Genpoint AS Oslo Research Park, Gaustadalléen 21 N-0349 Oslo / NO | ||
02 /
KOLPUS, Tone, Genpoint AS Oslo Research Park, Gaustadalléen 21 N-0349 Oslo / NO | Representative(s) | Gardner, Rebecca Katherine, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/44] | Gardner, Rebecca, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01901300.2 | 22.01.2001 | [2002/44] | WO2001GB00240 | Priority number, date | GB20000001450 | 21.01.2000 Original published format: GB 0001450 | [2002/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0153525 | Date: | 26.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1252328 | Date: | 30.10.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1252328 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/24, C12Q1/68, C12Q1/04 | [2002/44] | CPC: |
C12Q1/689 (EP,US);
C12Q1/24 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6834 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6834, C12Q2565/518 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/44] | Extension states | AL | 19.08.2002 | LT | 19.08.2002 | LV | 19.08.2002 | MK | 19.08.2002 | RO | 19.08.2002 | SI | 19.08.2002 | Title | German: | Verfahren und mittel zur Isolierung von Mikroorganismen | [2006/04] | English: | Method and means for isolating microorganisms | [2006/04] | French: | Procédé et moyen d'isolation de microorganismes | [2006/04] |
Former [2002/44] | ZELLE-ISOLIERUNGS-VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2002/44] | CELL ISOLATION METHOD | ||
Former [2002/44] | PROCEDE DESTINE A ISOLER DES CELLULES | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/44] | 21.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 19.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 14.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | EP07011726.2 / EP1865068 | Opposition(s) | 25.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/22] | Request for further processing for: | 14.08.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 14.08.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.09.2006 | Decision despatched | 17.11.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 17.11.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.11.2005 | Decision despatched | 19.07.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 20.07.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.08.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 20.06.2007 | TR | 20.06.2007 | PT | 20.11.2007 | [2010/37] |
Former [2009/33] | CY | 20.06.2007 | |
PT | 20.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | PT | 20.11.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4543328 (KELLER FRANZ [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,7,9,26 * claims 1,10-16,19 * * column 2, line 27 - line 35 * * column 2, line 50 - line 55 ** column 3, line 29 - line 36 *; | [X]US4935147 (ULLMAN EDWIN F [US], et al) [X] 1-26 * claims 1-11,21-26 * * column 3, line 23 - line 54 * * column 4, lines 50-63 * * column 7, line 14 - line 35 * * column 16, line 22 - line 48 *; | [X]WO9106007 (US HEALTH [US]) [X] 1-8,10-26 * claims 1-9,11-13,15-19 * * page 2, line 3 - line 28 * * page 5, line 20 - page 6, line 5 * * page 7, line 21 - line 32 * * example 3 *; | [X]US5696000 (KRIVAN HOWARD C [US], et al) [X] 1-8,10-26 * claims 1-8,17-26 * * column 2, line 24 - line 26 * * column 3, line 14 - line 36 * * column 6, line 1 - line 8 * * column 7, line 9 - line 43 * * column 9, line 3 - line 20 * * table III *; | [E]EP1118676 (CHEMAGEN AG [DE]) [E] 1-26 * the whole document * |