EP1263892 - UV CURABLE TRANSPARENT CONDUCTIVE COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.01.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.02.2010 [2010/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Allied Photochemical, Inc. 48 North Airport Drive Kimball, MI 48074 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/45] | For all designated states Allied PhotoChemical, Inc. 48 North Airport Drive Kimball, MI 48074 / US | ||
Former [2002/50] | For all designated states UV Specialties, Inc. 48 N. Airport Drive Kimball, MI 48074 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KROHN, Roy, C. 3540 Orvall Drive Fort Gratiot, MI 48059 / US | [2002/50] | Representative(s) | Thomas, Simon, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 3rd Floor 33 Glasshouse Street London W1B 5DG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/50] | Thomas, Simon, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | ||
Former [2002/50] | Green, Mark Charles, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | Application number, filing date | 01902006.4 | 11.01.2001 | [2002/50] | WO2001US00976 | Priority number, date | US20000175971P | 13.01.2000 Original published format: US 175971 P | [2002/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0151567 | Date: | 19.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1263892 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C09D4/06, C08F290/06, C08F290/14, C09D4/00, C08F220/18, C09D5/24 | [2002/50] | CPC: |
C09D5/24 (EP,US);
C09D4/00 (EP,US);
C09D4/06 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C09D4/00, C08F220/1811 (US,EP);
C09D4/06, C08F290/06 (US,EP);
C09D4/06, C08F290/14 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DURCH UV-STRAHLUNG HÄRTBARE, DURCHSICHTIGE UND LEITFÄHIGE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2002/50] | English: | UV CURABLE TRANSPARENT CONDUCTIVE COMPOSITIONS | [2002/50] | French: | COMPOSITIONS CONDUCTIBLES TRANSPARENTES QUI PEUT SECHER AUX U.V. | [2002/50] | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/50] | 26.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/08] | 25.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XP]WO0062586 (ALLIED PHOTOCHEMICAL INC [US]) [XP] 1-19 * whole document *; | [XAY]US5180757 (LUCEY MICHAEL [US]) [X] 1 * column 5, line 51 - column 8, line 39 * * column 12, line 58 - line 65 * * column 17, line 46 - column 18, line 38 * * column 20, line 37 - column 21, line 18 * * example - * * claims 1-4,12,13,37,39,40,45-47,51,54,55 * * idem. * * idem. * [A] 4,7,14,19 [Y] 2,3; | [XY]US4959178 (FRENTZEL RICHARD L [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 3, line 32 - line 36 * * column 3, line 54 - line 63 * * column 4, line 18 - line 47 * * examples: comparisons 5-7,9,11 * * claims 1,5,6,11-15 * * idem. * [Y] 2,3; | [XY]US5747115 (HOWELL BARBARA F [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 10 * * example - * * claims 1,2,11,12,14 * * idem. * [Y] 2,3; | [A]US5716551 (UNRUH GREG ROLAND [US], et al) [A] 1,7,14 * claim - * |