EP1244539 - PREHEATING AND DRYING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lofgren, Roland Fredriksdalsplatsen 2 25437 Helsingborg / SE | [2002/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/40] | Representative(s) | Söderman, Lisbeth Karin Iprbox oy/ Keilaranta 14 02150 Espoo / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2005/52] | Söderman, Päivi Karin Lisbeth Iprbox Oy Keilasatama 3 02150 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2002/40] | Söderman, Päivi Karin Lisbeth Innopat Ltd, P.O. Box 556 02151 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 01902883.6 | 05.01.2001 | [2002/40] | WO2001SE00014 | Priority number, date | US20000174452P | 05.01.2000 Original published format: US 174452 P | [2002/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0149471 | Date: | 12.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1244539 | Date: | 02.10.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1244539 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 12.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B29B13/02, B29B13/06 | [2002/40] | CPC: |
F26B25/002 (EP,US);
B29B13/021 (EP,US);
B29B13/065 (EP,US);
F26B3/08 (EP,US);
F26B9/103 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORHEIZUNGS- UND TROCKNUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2002/40] | English: | PREHEATING AND DRYING DEVICE | [2002/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PRECHAUFFAGE ET DE SECHAGE | [2002/40] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 07.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/40] | 02.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.12.2005 | BE | 28.12.2005 | CH | 28.12.2005 | CY | 28.12.2005 | FI | 28.12.2005 | FR | 28.12.2005 | LI | 28.12.2005 | NL | 28.12.2005 | TR | 28.12.2005 | IE | 05.01.2006 | LU | 31.01.2006 | MC | 31.01.2006 | DK | 28.03.2006 | GR | 28.03.2006 | SE | 28.03.2006 | ES | 08.04.2006 | PT | 29.05.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/52] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
CH | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
FR | 28.12.2005 | ||
LI | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
TR | 28.12.2005 | ||
IE | 05.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
Former [2008/40] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
CH | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
LI | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
TR | 28.12.2005 | ||
IE | 05.01.2006 | ||
FR | 31.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
Former [2008/37] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
CH | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
LI | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
TR | 28.12.2005 | ||
IE | 05.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
CH | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
LI | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
IE | 05.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
CH | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
IT | 28.12.2005 | ||
LI | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
IE | 05.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
CH | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
LI | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
IE | 05.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
CH | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
LI | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
IE | 05.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
CH | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
LI | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
IE | 05.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
CH | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
LI | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/44] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
CH | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
LI | 28.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
CH | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
LI | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 28.12.2005 | |
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 28.12.2005 | Cited in | International search | [AP]WO0030822 ; | [A]GB1106194 (JIYUICHI NARA); | [A]EP0312741 (NISSUI KAKO CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US5052596 (PHILIPPI KARL-HEINZ [DE]); | [AP]WO0053383 (TAMER INTERNATIONAL LTD [US], et al) | [AP] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2000, no. 37, Database accession no. 2000-430978, & WO0030822 A1 20000602 (SCHMALBACH LUBECA AG) |