EP1252732 - MUSIC DISTRIBUTION SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.11.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ochoa Optics LLC 2215B Renaissance Drive, Suite 5 Las Vegas, NV 89119 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/43] | For all designated states Ochoa Optics LLC 2215B Renaissance Drive Suite 5 Las Vegas NV 89119 / US | ||
Former [2002/44] | For all designated states World Theatre, Inc. Suite E, 900 Perimeter Park Drive Morrisville, NC 27560 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUNTER, Charles, Eric 7 Grey Widgeon Hilton Head Island, SC 29928 / US | 02 /
SPARKS, Kelly, C. Suite E, 900 Perimeter Park Drive Morrisville, NC 27560 / US | 03 /
HEBRANK, John, H. 216 Jefferson Drive Durham, NC 27712 / US | 04 /
BALLOU, Bernand, L., Jr. 11404 Blackbrook Court Raleigh, NC 27614 / US | [2002/44] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/44] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Steinsdorfstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01903184.8 | 22.01.2001 | [2002/44] | WO2001US01979 | Priority number, date | US20000487978 | 20.01.2000 Original published format: US 487978 | US20000493854 | 28.01.2000 Original published format: US 493854 | US20000502069 | 10.02.2000 Original published format: US 502069 | US20000684442 | 06.10.2000 Original published format: US 684442 | US20000707273 | 06.11.2000 Original published format: US 707273 | [2002/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0154324 | Date: | 26.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1252732 | Date: | 30.10.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1252732 | Date: | 17.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04H1/02, G06Q30/00 | [2006/29] | CPC: |
G11B27/031 (EP,US);
G06Q20/123 (EP,US);
G06Q20/1235 (EP,US);
G06Q30/06 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0601 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0623 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0633 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0641 (EP,US);
G07F17/0014 (EP,US);
H04H20/40 (EP,US);
H04H60/17 (EP,US);
H04H60/21 (EP,US);
H04H60/22 (EP,US);
H04H60/27 (EP,US);
H04H60/65 (EP,US);
H04N21/2543 (EP,US);
H04N21/262 (EP,US);
H04N21/44204 (EP,US);
H04N21/6143 (EP,US);
H04N21/63345 (EP,US);
H04N21/8106 (EP,US);
H04N21/8355 (EP,US);
H04N7/165 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2529 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2545 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2562 (EP,US);
G11B2220/41 (EP,US);
G11B27/034 (EP,US);
H04H20/74 (EP,US);
H04H60/06 (EP,US);
H04H60/11 (EP,US);
H04H60/23 (EP,US);
H04H60/46 (EP,US);
H04H60/66 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2002/44] | H04H1/02, G06F17/60 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MUSIKVERTEILUNGSSYSTEM | [2002/44] | English: | MUSIC DISTRIBUTION SYSTEMS | [2002/44] | French: | SYSTEMES DE DISTRIBUTION DE DONNEES AUDIO | [2002/44] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/44] | 22.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 05.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/52] | Request for further processing for: | 05.11.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 05.11.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.11.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   03.02.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.01.2007 | BE | 17.01.2007 | CH | 17.01.2007 | CY | 17.01.2007 | DK | 17.01.2007 | FI | 17.01.2007 | IT | 17.01.2007 | LI | 17.01.2007 | NL | 17.01.2007 | TR | 17.01.2007 | IE | 22.01.2007 | LU | 22.01.2007 | MC | 31.01.2007 | SE | 17.04.2007 | GR | 18.04.2007 | ES | 28.04.2007 | PT | 18.06.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 17.01.2007 | |
BE | 17.01.2007 | ||
CH | 17.01.2007 | ||
CY | 17.01.2007 | ||
DK | 17.01.2007 | ||
FI | 17.01.2007 | ||
IT | 17.01.2007 | ||
LI | 17.01.2007 | ||
NL | 17.01.2007 | ||
IE | 22.01.2007 | ||
LU | 22.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
SE | 17.04.2007 | ||
GR | 18.04.2007 | ||
ES | 28.04.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 17.01.2007 | |
BE | 17.01.2007 | ||
CH | 17.01.2007 | ||
CY | 17.01.2007 | ||
DK | 17.01.2007 | ||
FI | 17.01.2007 | ||
IT | 17.01.2007 | ||
LI | 17.01.2007 | ||
NL | 17.01.2007 | ||
IE | 22.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
SE | 17.04.2007 | ||
GR | 18.04.2007 | ||
ES | 28.04.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 17.01.2007 | |
BE | 17.01.2007 | ||
CH | 17.01.2007 | ||
DK | 17.01.2007 | ||
FI | 17.01.2007 | ||
IT | 17.01.2007 | ||
LI | 17.01.2007 | ||
NL | 17.01.2007 | ||
IE | 22.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
SE | 17.04.2007 | ||
GR | 18.04.2007 | ||
ES | 28.04.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 17.01.2007 | |
BE | 17.01.2007 | ||
CH | 17.01.2007 | ||
DK | 17.01.2007 | ||
FI | 17.01.2007 | ||
LI | 17.01.2007 | ||
NL | 17.01.2007 | ||
IE | 22.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
SE | 17.04.2007 | ||
GR | 18.04.2007 | ||
ES | 28.04.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/01] | AT | 17.01.2007 | |
BE | 17.01.2007 | ||
CH | 17.01.2007 | ||
DK | 17.01.2007 | ||
FI | 17.01.2007 | ||
LI | 17.01.2007 | ||
NL | 17.01.2007 | ||
IE | 22.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
SE | 17.04.2007 | ||
ES | 28.04.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 17.01.2007 | |
CH | 17.01.2007 | ||
DK | 17.01.2007 | ||
FI | 17.01.2007 | ||
LI | 17.01.2007 | ||
NL | 17.01.2007 | ||
IE | 22.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
SE | 17.04.2007 | ||
ES | 28.04.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT | 17.01.2007 | |
CH | 17.01.2007 | ||
DK | 17.01.2007 | ||
FI | 17.01.2007 | ||
LI | 17.01.2007 | ||
NL | 17.01.2007 | ||
SE | 17.04.2007 | ||
ES | 28.04.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | CH | 17.01.2007 | |
FI | 17.01.2007 | ||
LI | 17.01.2007 | ||
NL | 17.01.2007 | ||
SE | 17.04.2007 | ||
ES | 28.04.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | CH | 17.01.2007 | |
FI | 17.01.2007 | ||
LI | 17.01.2007 | ||
SE | 17.04.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | CH | 17.01.2007 | |
FI | 17.01.2007 | ||
LI | 17.01.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | FI | 17.01.2007 | |
PT | 18.06.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5355302 (MARTIN JOHN R [US], et al) [A] 1-14,16-26* column 3, line 4 - column 8, line 42 *; | [Y]US5592511 (SCHOEN NEIL C [US], et al) [Y] 1-14,16-26 * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 47 *; | [A]US5619247 (RUSSO JAMES [US]) [A] 1-14,16-26 * column 3, line 40 - column 11, line 31 *; | [Y]US5721827 (LOGAN JAMES [US], et al) [Y] 1-14,16-26 * column 3, line 1 - column 7, line 21 * |