EP1274388 - Cosmetic compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/03] | COLOR-DEPOSITING SHAMPOO | ||
[2006/33] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aveda Corporation 4000 Pheasant Ridge Drive, N.E. Blaine, MN 55449-7106 / US | [2003/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAPSNER, Timothy, Roland 5240 Abbott Avenue South Minneapolis, MN 55410 / US | 02 /
MATRAVERS, Peter 4235 Minnesota Lane North Plymouth, MN 55446-2737 / US | [2003/03] | Representative(s) | Hirsch & Associés 154 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/03] | Cabinet Hirsch 34, Rue de Bassano 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 01903447.9 | 31.01.2001 | [2003/03] | WO2001US03114 | Priority number, date | US20000547895 | 12.04.2000 Original published format: US 547895 | [2003/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0178664 | Date: | 25.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1274388 | Date: | 15.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1274388 | Date: | 16.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q5/00, A61Q5/02, A61Q19/10, A61K8/60 | [2006/33] | CPC: |
A61K8/60 (EP,US);
A61K8/73 (KR);
A61Q5/02 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q5/06 (KR);
A61Q5/065 (EP,US);
A61Q5/12 (EP,US);
A61K2800/432 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/03] | A61K7/06, A61K7/08, A61K7/50 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/03] | Title | German: | Kosmetische Zusammensetzungen | [2006/33] | English: | Cosmetic compositions | [2006/33] | French: | Compositions cosmétiques | [2006/33] |
Former [2003/03] | FARBAUFTRAGENDES SHAMPOO | ||
Former [2003/03] | COLOR-DEPOSITING SHAMPOO | ||
Former [2003/03] | SHAMPOOING COLORANT | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2002 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2001 | Examination requested [2003/03] | 07.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
31.01.2008
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Patente (FJP) 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [2009/04] |
Former [2008/10] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
31.01.2008
Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien Patente (VTP) 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | 27.03.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 29.09.2008 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 29.05.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.06.2009 | 29.05.2009 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 25.06.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 06.07.2009 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2009/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 16.05.2007 | CY | 16.05.2007 | DK | 16.05.2007 | FI | 16.05.2007 | LI | 16.05.2007 | NL | 16.05.2007 | TR | 16.05.2007 | SE | 16.08.2007 | GR | 17.08.2007 | PT | 16.10.2007 | LU | 31.01.2008 | MC | 31.01.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/32] | CH | 16.05.2007 | |
CY | 16.05.2007 | ||
DK | 16.05.2007 | ||
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
LI | 16.05.2007 | ||
NL | 16.05.2007 | ||
SE | 16.08.2007 | ||
GR | 17.08.2007 | ||
PT | 16.10.2007 | ||
LU | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | CH | 16.05.2007 | |
CY | 16.05.2007 | ||
DK | 16.05.2007 | ||
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
LI | 16.05.2007 | ||
NL | 16.05.2007 | ||
SE | 16.08.2007 | ||
GR | 17.08.2007 | ||
PT | 16.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/40] | CH | 16.05.2007 | |
DK | 16.05.2007 | ||
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
LI | 16.05.2007 | ||
NL | 16.05.2007 | ||
SE | 16.08.2007 | ||
GR | 17.08.2007 | ||
PT | 16.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/19] | CH | 16.05.2007 | |
DK | 16.05.2007 | ||
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
LI | 16.05.2007 | ||
NL | 16.05.2007 | ||
SE | 16.08.2007 | ||
GR | 17.08.2007 | ||
PT | 16.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | CH | 16.05.2007 | |
DK | 16.05.2007 | ||
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
LI | 16.05.2007 | ||
NL | 16.05.2007 | ||
SE | 16.08.2007 | ||
PT | 16.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | CH | 16.05.2007 | |
DK | 16.05.2007 | ||
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
LI | 16.05.2007 | ||
NL | 16.05.2007 | ||
SE | 16.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | CH | 16.05.2007 | |
DK | 16.05.2007 | ||
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
LI | 16.05.2007 | ||
SE | 16.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | CH | 16.05.2007 | |
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
LI | 16.05.2007 | ||
SE | 16.08.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0559375 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-4,6-13,15-25 * example -; claims 1,8,9 *; | [X]WO9417783 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-4,6-13,15-25 * example 9; claims 1,6-8 *; | [A]US5741769 (ERILLI RITA [BE]) [A] 1-4,7-9,15* example 1; claim 1 * | Examination | WO0055293 | - URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20040307044622/http://www.pilotchemical.com/pilot-crossref/personal.htm |