EP1251871 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION FOR IMMUNOMODULATION AND PREPARATION OF VACCINES COMPRISING AN ANTIGEN AND AS ADJUVANTS AN IMMUNOGENIC OLIGODEOXYNUCLEOTIDE AND A POLYCATIONIC POLYPEPTIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/44] | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION FOR IMMUNOMODULATION AND PREPARATION OF VACCINES COMPRISING AN ANTIGEN AND AN IMMUNOGENIC OLIGODEOXYNUCLEOTIDE AND A POLYCATIONIC POLYMER AS ADJUVANTS | ||
[2007/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intercell AG Campus Vienna Biocenter 6 1030 Wien / AT | [2008/13] |
Former [2002/44] | For all designated states Cistem Biotechnologies GmbH Rennweg 95 B 1030 Vienna / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINGNAU, Karen Gallgasse 8/10 A-1130 Vienna / AT | 02 /
MATTNER, Frank Krottenbachstrasse 267/D12 A-1190 Vienna / AT | 03 /
SCHMIDT, Walter Steingasse 18/1/10 A-1030 Vienna / AT | 04 /
BIRNSTIEL, Max Nucleo CH-6953 Lugaggia / CH | 05 /
BUSCHLE, Michael Goethestrasse 2/2/9 A-2380 Perchtoldsdorf / AT | [2002/44] | Representative(s) | Alge, Daniel, et al Sonn Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/44] | Alge, Daniel, Mag. Dr. rer.nat., et al Patentanwälte Sonn, Pawloy, Weinzinger & Köhler-Pavlik Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 01903625.0 | 05.01.2001 | [2002/44] | WO2001EP00087 | Priority number, date | AT20000000129 | 28.01.2000 Original published format: AT 1292000 | [2002/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0154720 | Date: | 02.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1251871 | Date: | 30.10.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1251871 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/39, A61K39/002, A61K39/02, A61K39/12, A61P35/00, A61P37/00, A61K31/722, A61K31/7125, C07K14/34 | [2007/41] | CPC: |
A61K39/39 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61K2039/555 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55561 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K39/39, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K39/39, A61K39/00, A61K38/02 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2002/44] | A61K39/39, A61K39/002, A61K39/02, A61K39/12, A61P35/00, A61P37/00, A61K31/722, A61K31/7125, C07K14/34, // C07K14:155 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR IMMUNSTIMULATION UND ZUR ZUBEREITUNG VON IMPFSTOFFEN ENTHALTEND EIN ANTIGEN, UND ALS ADJUVANTIEN EIN IMMUNOGENES OLIGODESOXYNUKLEOTID UND EIN POLYKATIONISCHES POLYPEPTID | [2007/37] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION FOR IMMUNOMODULATION AND PREPARATION OF VACCINES COMPRISING AN ANTIGEN AND AS ADJUVANTS AN IMMUNOGENIC OLIGODEOXYNUCLEOTIDE AND A POLYCATIONIC POLYPEPTIDE | [2007/25] | French: | COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE POUR IMMUNOMODULATION ET PREPARATION DE VACCINS COMPRENANT UN ANTIGENE, ET COMME ADJUVANTS UN OLIGODESOXYRIBONUCLEOTIDE IMMUNOGENE ET UN POLYPEPTIDE POLYCATIONIQUE | [2007/25] |
Former [2002/44] | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR IMMUNSTIMULATION UND ZUR ZUBEREITUNG VON IMPFSTOFFEN ENTHALTEND EIN ANTIGEN, EIN IMMUNOGENES OLIGOOXYNUKLEOTID UND EIN POLYKATIONISCHES POLYMER ALS ADJUVANTIEN | ||
Former [2002/44] | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION FOR IMMUNOMODULATION AND PREPARATION OF VACCINES COMPRISING AN ANTIGEN AND AN IMMUNOGENIC OLIGODEOXYNUCLEOTIDE AND A POLYCATIONIC POLYMER AS ADJUVANTS | ||
Former [2002/44] | COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE POUR IMMUNOMODULATION ET PREPARATION DE VACCINS COMPRENANT UN ANTIGENE, UN OLIGODESOXYRIBONUCLEOTIDE IMMUNOGENE ET POLYMERE POLYCATIONIQUE SOUS FORME D'ADJUVANTS | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/44] | 13.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 24.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.04.2008 | BE | 23.04.2008 | CY | 23.04.2008 | DK | 23.04.2008 | FI | 23.04.2008 | NL | 23.04.2008 | TR | 23.04.2008 | SE | 23.07.2008 | GR | 24.07.2008 | PT | 23.09.2008 | IE | 05.01.2009 | LU | 05.01.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
BE | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
GR | 24.07.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
IE | 05.01.2009 | ||
LU | 05.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
BE | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
GR | 24.07.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
IE | 05.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
BE | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
IE | 05.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
BE | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5109026 (HOSKINSON RONALD M [AU], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]WO9730721 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]WO9938528 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 8; claim 1 *; | [A] - BUSCHLE M ET AL, "Transloading of tumor antigen-derived peptides into antigen-presenting cells", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA,US,NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, (19970401), vol. 94, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 3256 - 3261, XP002086009 [A] 1-11 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.94.7.3256 | [A] - BUSCHLE M ET AL, "DEVELOPMENT OF DEFINED, SYNTHETIC VACCINES BY IN VIVO CHARGING OF ANTIGEN PRESENTING CELLS WITH ANTIGEN", JOURNAL OF INVESTIGATIVE DERMATOLOGY,NEW YORK, NY,US, (200001), vol. 114, no. 1, ISSN 0022-202X, page 235, XP000996450 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | [A] - GALL D ET AL, "ADJUVANT ACTIVITY OF POLYELECTROLYTES", IMMUNOLOGY,OXFORD,GB, (1972), vol. 23, no. 4, ISSN 0019-2805, pages 569 - 575, XP000995977 [A] 1-11 * page 570 * | [A] - SCHMIDT ET AL., "Cell-free tumor antigen peptide-based cancer vaccines", PNAS, (199704), vol. 94, pages 3262 - 3267, XP002168512 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.94.7.3262 | [A] - MCCLUSKIE M J ET AL, "NOVEL STRATEGIES USING DNA FOR THE INDUCTION OF MUCOSAL IMMUNITY", CRITICAL REVIEWS IN IMMUNOLOGY,CRC PRESS, INC,XX, (1999), vol. 19, no. 4, ISSN 1040-8401, pages 303 - 329, XP000995880 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | Examination | - TOSSI ET AL, "Amphipathic, alpha-helical antimicrobial peptides.", BIOPOLYMERS, (2000), vol. 55, no. 30, pages 4 - 30 | - MCCLUSKIE; DAVIES, "CpG DNA as mucosal adjuvant", VACCINE, (2000), vol. 18, pages 231 - 237 | - DALLAS; FALKOW, "Amino acid sequence homology between cholera toxin and Escherichia Coli heat-labile toxin", NATURE, (198012), vol. 288, no. 4, pages 499 - 501 |