EP1190268 - ELECTRIC LAMP AND INTERFERENCE FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.12.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2008/39] |
Former [2002/13] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COTTAAR, Eduardus, J., E. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2002/13] | Representative(s) | van Wermeskerken, Stephanie Christine, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/14] | van Wermeskerken, Stephanie Christine, et al International Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2002/13] | Mulder, Cornelis A.M., et al Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 01903652.4 | 16.01.2001 | [2002/13] | WO2001EP00472 | Priority number, date | EP20000200368 | 03.02.2000 Original published format: EP 00200368 | [2002/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0157913 | Date: | 09.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1190268 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/28 | [2002/13] | CPC: |
H01J61/40 (EP,US);
H01K1/32 (KR);
G02B5/282 (EP,US);
H01J61/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2004/21] |
Former [2002/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE LAMPE UND INTERFERENZSCHICHT | [2002/13] | English: | ELECTRIC LAMP AND INTERFERENCE FILM | [2002/13] | French: | LAMPE ELECTRIQUE ET FILM D'INTERFERENCE | [2002/13] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/36] | 14.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/06] | 07.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0409554 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [DA] 1-8 * column 3, line 37 - column 4, line 46 * * column 9, line 21 - line 25 * * claims 1,2 *; | [X]US5705882 (OUGHTON ANDRE R [US]) [X] 1-8 * column 7, line 10 - line 30; figure 5 *; | [A]WO0002231 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-8* page 10, line 2 - page 11, line 23; figure 3 * |