EP1250256 - MOTOR UNIT FOR A SHIP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 11.05.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2012 | Revocation of patent | published on 13.06.2012 [2012/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Oy Strömbergintie 1 00380 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2002/43] | For all designated states ABB Oy Strömbergintie 1 00380 Helsinki / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VARIS, Jukka Viherlaaksonranta 10 B 27 FIN-02710 Espoo / FI | [2002/43] | Representative(s) | Westerholm, Carl Christian, et al Boco IP Oy Ab Itämerenkatu 5 00180 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2005/20] | Westerholm, Carl Christian, et al Borenius & Co Oy AB Tallberginkatu 2 A 00180 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2002/43] | Hjelt, Dag Silvio Hjalmar Andrea, et al Borenius & Co Oy Ab, Kansakoulukuja 3 00100 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 01903825.6 | 26.01.2001 | [2002/43] | WO2001FI00077 | Priority number, date | FI20000000190 | 28.01.2000 Original published format: FI 20000190 | [2002/43] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0154973 | Date: | 02.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1250256 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1250256 | Date: | 24.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 02.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B63H5/125, B63H20/12, B63H21/17 | [2002/43] | CPC: |
B63J2/12 (EP,US);
B63H1/28 (KR);
B63H23/24 (EP,US);
B63H5/125 (EP,US);
B63H2005/1258 (EP,US);
B63H5/07 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2005/35] |
Former [2002/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | 15.08.2002 | LT | 15.08.2002 | LV | 15.08.2002 | MK | 15.08.2002 | RO | 15.08.2002 | SI | 15.08.2002 | Title | German: | MOTOREINHEIT FÜR SCHIFFE | [2002/43] | English: | MOTOR UNIT FOR A SHIP | [2002/43] | French: | BLOC MOTEUR POUR UN NAVIRE | [2002/43] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2001 | Translation filed | 15.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 15.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 15.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/43] | 20.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05105483.1 / EP1574425 | EP05105704.0 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 28.07.2005 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.05.2006
24.07.2007
ADMISSIBLE Rolls-Royce Aktiebolag P.O. Box 1010 681 29 Kristinehamn / SE Opponent's representative Holmberg, Nils Anders Patrik, et al, et al BRANN AB P.O. Box 12246 102 26 Stockholm / SE | 02
24.05.2006
24.07.2007
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.05.2006
24.07.2007
ADMISSIBLE Rolls-Royce Aktiebolag P.O. Box 1010 681 29 Kristinehamn / SE Opponent's representative Holmberg, Nils Anders Patrik, et al, et al BRANN AB Västgötagatan 2 P.O. Box 17192 104 62 Stockholm / SE | ||
02
24.05.2006
24.07.2007
ADMISSIBLE SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | |||
Former [2006/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.05.2006
ADMISSIBLE Rolls-Royce Aktiebolag P.O. Box 1010 681 29 Kristinehamn / SE Opponent's representative Holmberg, Nils Anders Patrik, et al, et al Dr Ludwig Brann Patentbyra AB P.O. Box 17192 104 62 Stockholm / SE | ||
02
24.05.2006
Siemens AG Abteilung CT IP A&D Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | 30.06.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.12.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 09.01.2007 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06) | 09.05.2007 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 27.01.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.03.2009 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 16.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 01.02.2012 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2012/24] | Appeal following opposition | 12.05.2009 | Appeal received No. T1058/09 | 15.07.2009 | Statement of grounds filed | 01.02.2012 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 01.02.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.02.2012 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.08.2005 | BE | 24.08.2005 | CH | 24.08.2005 | CY | 24.08.2005 | FI | 24.08.2005 | LI | 24.08.2005 | TR | 24.08.2005 | GR | 24.11.2005 | PT | 24.01.2006 | IE | 26.01.2006 | LU | 31.01.2006 | MC | 31.01.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 24.08.2005 | |
BE | 24.08.2005 | ||
CH | 24.08.2005 | ||
FI | 24.08.2005 | ||
LI | 24.08.2005 | ||
TR | 24.08.2005 | ||
GR | 24.11.2005 | ||
PT | 24.01.2006 | ||
IE | 26.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | AT | 24.08.2005 | |
BE | 24.08.2005 | ||
CH | 24.08.2005 | ||
FI | 24.08.2005 | ||
LI | 24.08.2005 | ||
GR | 24.11.2005 | ||
PT | 24.01.2006 | ||
IE | 26.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 24.08.2005 | |
BE | 24.08.2005 | ||
CH | 24.08.2005 | ||
FI | 24.08.2005 | ||
LI | 24.08.2005 | ||
GR | 24.11.2005 | ||
PT | 24.01.2006 | ||
IE | 26.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/44] | AT | 24.08.2005 | |
BE | 24.08.2005 | ||
CH | 24.08.2005 | ||
FI | 24.08.2005 | ||
LI | 24.08.2005 | ||
GR | 24.11.2005 | ||
PT | 24.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 24.08.2005 | |
BE | 24.08.2005 | ||
CH | 24.08.2005 | ||
FI | 24.08.2005 | ||
LI | 24.08.2005 | ||
GR | 24.11.2005 | ||
PT | 24.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 24.08.2005 | |
CH | 24.08.2005 | ||
FI | 24.08.2005 | ||
LI | 24.08.2005 | ||
GR | 24.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 24.08.2005 | |
FI | 24.08.2005 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0590867 (KVAERNER MASA YARDS OY [FI]); | [Y]US5379714 (LEWIS JAMES E [US], et al); | [A]US5417597 (LEVEDAHL WILLIAM J [US]); | [X]EP0816222 (MORIYAMA IND [JP]); | [XP]EP1010614 (ABB IND SPA [IT]) |