EP1259343 - EQUIPMENT FOR SUPPLYING MOLTEN METAL TO A CONTINUOUS CASTING INGOT MOULD AND METHOD FOR USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2004 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.03.2007 [2007/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROTELEC Tour Mercuriales 40, rue Jean Jaurès 93170 Bagnolet / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/17] | For all designated states ROTELEC Tour Mercuriales 40, rue Jean Jaurès 93170 Bagnolet / FR | ||
Former [2002/48] | For all designated states ROTELEC S.A. Les Mercuriales - Tour du Ponant, 40, Rue Jean-Jaurès F-93176 Bagnolet / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUNSTREICH, Siebo 27, rue Eugène Berthoud F-93400 Saint Ouen / FR | 02 /
NOVE, Marie-Claude 46, rue Lemercier F-75017 Paris / FR | [2002/48] | Representative(s) | Ventavoli, Roger, et al Cabinet ROVE Conseils 47, rue de Paris B.P. 50229 57106 Thionville Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/17] | Ventavoli, Roger, et al Cabinet ROVE Conseils, 47, rue de Paris, P.B. 50229 57106 Thionville Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2002/48] | Ventavoli, Roger Cabinet ROVE Conseils, 47, rue de Paris, P.B. 50229 57106 Thionville Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 01903983.3 | 29.01.2001 | [2002/48] | WO2001FR00263 | Priority number, date | FR20000002501 | 29.02.2000 Original published format: FR 0002501 | [2002/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0164373 | Date: | 07.09.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1259343 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1259343 | Date: | 03.09.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/10, B22D11/12, B22D41/50 | [2002/48] | CPC: |
B22D11/122 (EP,US);
B22D11/115 (EP,KR,US);
B22D41/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESCHICKUNG VON FLÜSSIGEM METALL IN EINE STRANGGUSSKOKILLE UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2002/48] | English: | EQUIPMENT FOR SUPPLYING MOLTEN METAL TO A CONTINUOUS CASTING INGOT MOULD AND METHOD FOR USING SAME | [2002/48] | French: | EQUIPEMENT POUR ALIMENTER EN METAL EN FUSION UNE LINGOTIERE DE COULEE CONTINUE ET SON PROCEDE D'UTILISATION | [2002/48] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/48] | 10.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 03.09.2003 | FI | 03.09.2003 | IE | 03.09.2003 | TR | 03.09.2003 | DK | 03.12.2003 | GR | 03.12.2003 | LU | 29.01.2004 | MC | 31.01.2004 | PT | 03.02.2004 | [2007/10] |
Former [2006/51] | FI | 03.09.2003 | |
IE | 03.09.2003 | ||
TR | 03.09.2003 | ||
DK | 03.12.2003 | ||
GR | 03.12.2003 | ||
LU | 29.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
PT | 03.02.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 03.09.2003 | |
IE | 03.09.2003 | ||
DK | 03.12.2003 | ||
GR | 03.12.2003 | ||
LU | 29.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
PT | 03.02.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 03.09.2003 | |
IE | 03.09.2003 | ||
DK | 03.12.2003 | ||
GR | 03.12.2003 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
PT | 03.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 03.09.2003 | |
IE | 03.09.2003 | ||
DK | 03.12.2003 | ||
GR | 03.12.2003 | ||
PT | 03.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | FI | 03.09.2003 | |
IE | 03.09.2003 | ||
GR | 03.12.2003 | ||
PT | 03.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/29] | FI | 03.09.2003 | |
IE | 03.09.2003 | ||
GR | 03.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | FI | 03.09.2003 | |
GR | 03.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/12] | FI | 03.09.2003 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH08257692 ; | [A]JPH11197807 ; | [A]EP0321206 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO [JP]) [A] 1-12 * page 8, line 1 - line 14 * * figures 2A,2B,3,11 *; | [DA]WO9212814 (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [SE]) [DA] 1-12 * page 7, line 17 - page 11, line 24 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP0685282 (DANIELI OFF MECC [IT]) [A] 1-12 * figure 2 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970228), vol. 1997, no. 02, & JP08257692 A 19961008 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [X] 1,9,11,12 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991029), vol. 1999, no. 12, & JP11197807 A 19990727 (KAWASAKI STEEL CORP) [A] 1-12 * abstract * |