EP1293202 - REMEDIES FOR DEGENERATIVE ARTHRITIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.2007 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.02.2007 [2007/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 1-5, Doshomachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8526 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/12] | For all designated states ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 1-5, Doshomachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8526 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAEDA, Yoshizou Minase Res.Inst. ONO Pharma.Co.Ltd 1-1, Sakurai 3-chome, Shimamotocho Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-8585 / JP | 02 /
YONETOMI, Yasuo Minase Res.Inst. ONO Pharma.Co.Ltd 1-1, Sakurai 3-chome, Shimamotocho Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-8585 / JP | 03 /
OGAWA, Koji Minase Res. Inst. ONO Pharma. Co. Ltd 1-1, Sakurai 3-chome, Shimamotocho Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-8585 / JP | [2003/12] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/12] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel Möhlstrasse 37 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01904367.8 | 09.02.2001 | [2003/12] | WO2001JP00914 | Priority number, date | JP20000033422 | 10.02.2000 Original published format: JP 2000033422 | [2003/12] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0158440 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1293202 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.08.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/166, A61P19/02 | [2003/12] | CPC: |
A61K31/166 (EP,KR,US);
A61P19/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HEILMITTEL FÜR DEGENERATIVE ARTHRITIS | [2003/12] | English: | REMEDIES FOR DEGENERATIVE ARTHRITIS | [2003/12] | French: | MEDICAMENTS POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE L'ARTHRITE DEGENERATIVE | [2003/12] | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.2002 | Translation filed | 07.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 07.08.2002 | Search fee paid | 07.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 07.08.2002 | Examination requested [2003/12] | 25.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/09] | 11.10.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9718188 (ABBOTT LAB [US]); | [PX] - YAMADA A AND ALL., "ONO-4817, an orally active matrix metalloproteinase inhibitor, prevents lipopolysaccharide-induced proteoglycan release from the joint cartilage in guinea pigs", INFLAMMATION RESEARCH, (200004), vol. 49, no. 4, pages 144 - 146, XP002302945 [PX] 1 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s000110050573 | International search | [Y]WO9919296 (ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP], et al); | [Y]EP0935963 (PFIZER PROD INC [US]); | [Y]WO9951572 (SANKYO CO [JP], et al); | [Y] - E.M. O'BYRNE ET AL., "Oral administration of a matrix metallo proteinase inhibitor, CGS 27023A, protects the cartilage proteoglycan matrix in a partial meniscectomy model of osteo arthritis in rabbit", INFLAMM. RES., vol. 44, no. SUPPLEMENT 2, pages S117 - S118, XP002941588 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01778290 |