EP1246664 - ELECTRODE DEVICE FOR USE IN LAPAROSCOPIC SURGERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Transneuronix, Inc. Suite 106, 100 Stierli Court Mt. Arlington, NJ 07856 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/41] | For all designated states Transneuronix, Inc. Suite 106, 100 Stierli Court Mt. Arlington, NJ 07856 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JENKINS, David, A. 6 Brendon Drive Flanders, NJ 07836 / US | [2002/41] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/41] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01904838.8 | 10.01.2001 | [2002/41] | WO2001US00983 | Priority number, date | US20000480727 | 10.01.2000 Original published format: US 480727 | US20000713553 | 15.11.2000 Original published format: US 713553 | [2002/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0152932 | Date: | 26.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1246664 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/05 | [2002/41] | CPC: |
A61N1/05 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/41] | Title | German: | ELEKTRODENEINRICHTUNG ZUR VERWENDUNG IN DER LAPAROSKOPISCHEN CHIRURGIE | [2002/41] | English: | ELECTRODE DEVICE FOR USE IN LAPAROSCOPIC SURGERY | [2002/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF A ELECTRODES A UTILISER EN CHIRURGIE LAPAROSCOPIQUE | [2002/41] | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/41] | 21.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/44] | 08.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]US5423872 (CIGAINA VALERIO [IT]) [AD] 1,21,37 * column 1, line 40 - column 2, line 12; figure - *; | [A]US5716392 (BOURGEOIS IVAN [BE], et al) [A] 1,21,37 * column 5, line 30 - column 6, line 27; figure - *; | [A]US5836994 (BOURGEOIS IVAN [BE]) [A] 1,21,37 * column 2, line 65 - column 4, line 15; figure - *; | [A]US5922015 (SCHALDACH MAX [DE]) [A] 1,21,37* column 5, line 25 - column 7, line 13; figure - * | Examination | WO98535878 | by applicant | US5423872 | US20000181320 |