EP1252350 - HIGH TEMPERATURE THERMAL PROCESSING ALLOY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inco Alloys International, Inc. 3200 Riverside Drive Huntington, WV 25705 / US | [2006/22] |
Former [2002/44] | For all designated states INCO ALLOYS INTERNATIONAL, INC. 3200 Riverside Drive Huntington West Virginia 25702 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FARR, Norman, C. 5 Chartwell Road Hereford / GB | 02 /
SMITH, Gaylord, D. 120 Stamford Park Drive Huntington, WV 25705 / US | [2002/44] | Representative(s) | Hedley, Nicholas James Matthew Kilburn & Strode LLP Lancon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/44] | Hedley, Nicholas James Matthew Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01905029.3 | 24.01.2001 | [2002/44] | WO2001US02369 | Priority number, date | US20000177861P | 24.01.2000 Original published format: US 177861 P | [2002/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0153551 | Date: | 26.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1252350 | Date: | 30.10.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1252350 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.07.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C22C19/03, C22C19/05, H05B3/12 | [2003/18] | CPC: |
C22C19/055 (EP,US);
C22C19/056 (EP,US);
C22C19/058 (EP,US);
F27D1/0006 (EP,US);
F27D5/00 (EP,US);
F27D2099/0008 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/44] | C22C19/03, C22C19/05 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/44] | Title | German: | LEGIERUNG ZUR THERMISCHEN BEHANDLUNG BEI HOHEN TEMPERATUREN | [2002/44] | English: | HIGH TEMPERATURE THERMAL PROCESSING ALLOY | [2002/44] | French: | ALLIAGE POUR TRAITEMENT THERMIQUE A HAUTE TEMPERATURE | [2006/15] |
Former [2002/44] | ALLIAGE POUR TRAITEMENT THERMIQUE HAUTE TEMPERATURE | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2002 | Search fee paid | 09.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 07.08.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/44] | 16.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 19.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/34] | Request for further processing for: | 04.07.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 07.07.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.10.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 13.09.2006 | CH | 13.09.2006 | CY | 13.09.2006 | FI | 13.09.2006 | LI | 13.09.2006 | NL | 13.09.2006 | TR | 13.09.2006 | DK | 13.12.2006 | GR | 14.12.2006 | IE | 24.01.2007 | LU | 24.01.2007 | MC | 31.01.2007 | PT | 26.02.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | BE | 13.09.2006 | |
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
CY | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
GR | 14.12.2006 | ||
IE | 24.01.2007 | ||
LU | 24.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | BE | 13.09.2006 | |
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
GR | 14.12.2006 | ||
IE | 24.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | BE | 13.09.2006 | |
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
IE | 24.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | BE | 13.09.2006 | |
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
IT | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
IE | 24.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | BE | 13.09.2006 | |
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
IT | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | BE | 13.09.2006 | |
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
IT | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | BE | 13.09.2006 | |
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/26] | CH | 13.09.2006 | |
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CH | 13.09.2006 | |
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | CH | 13.09.2006 | |
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS61159543 ; | [X]JPH07188819 ; | [A]JPS59107053 ; | [A]US2815283 (WALTER BETTERIDGE, et al); | [A]US3865581 (SEKINO SHOZO, et al); | [A]US4671931 (HERCHENROEDER ROBERT B [US], et al); | [A]GB2199592 (INCO ALLOYS INT, et al); | [A]EP0322992 (BELL IRH PTY LTD [AU]); | [A]US4877465 (DONATI JEAN R [FR], et al) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861204), vol. 010, no. 362, Database accession no. (C - 389), & JP61159543 A 19860719 (DAIDO STEEL CO LTD) [X] 1-8 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951130), vol. 1995, no. 10, & JP07188819 A 19950725 (DAIDO STEEL CO LTD) [X] 1-8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841009), vol. 008, no. 222, Database accession no. (C - 246), & JP59107053 A 19840621 (SUMITOMO KINZOKU KOUZAN KK;OTHERS: 01) [A] * abstract * | International search | [Y]US3582616 (WROB RONALD M); | [Y]US3592061 (SCHWEDLAND RONALD P, et al); | [Y]US3876475 (RAMQVIST LARS HENRY); | [Y]US3916497 (DOI HIDEKAZU, et al); | [X]US4153455 (EISELSTEIN HERBERT L, et al); | [X]JPS552773 (SUMITOMO METAL IND); | [Y]US4195987 (HERCHENROEDER ROBERT B H [US]); | [X]US4227925 (HOSOI YUZO, et al); | [X]JPS5635737 (SUMITOMO METAL IND); | [X]US4400209 (KUDO TAKEO [JP], et al); | [X]JPS61288041 (BABCOCK HITACHI KK); | [A]US4844864 (FRANK RICHARD B [US]) |