EP1259764 - FURNACE DIAGNOSTIC SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robertshaw Controls Company Suite 400 2809 Emerywood Parkway Richmond, VA 23294 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/35] | For all designated states Robertshaw Controls Company Suite 400, 2809 Emerywood Parkway Richmond, VA 23294 / US | ||
Former [2002/48] | For all designated states Invensys Robertshaw Controls Company Suite 400, 2809 Emerywood Parkway Richmond, VA 23294 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANTHONY, W., Abraham 30422 La Vue Laguna Niguel, CA 92677 / US | 02 /
JOSEPH, G., Raffaelli 1020 Descanso Drive La Canada, CA 91011 / US | 03 /
ROBERT, W., Cuomo 1209 Southridge Drive Fort Collins, CO 80521 / US | 04 /
DEREK, Daniel, Johnson 1816 Jocelyn Drive Loveland, CO 80537 / US | 05 /
ROBERT, Wayne, Lewis 16015 Ardath Avenue Gardena, CA 90249 / US | 06 /
ELDON, Vaughn 1871 Mariposa Lane Fullerton, CA 92833 / US | [2002/48] | Representative(s) | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/48] | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01905107.7 | 24.01.2001 | [2002/48] | WO2001US02643 | Priority number, date | US20000178837P | 28.01.2000 Original published format: US 178837 P | [2002/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0155644 | Date: | 02.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1259764 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1259764 | Date: | 08.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F23N5/24 | [2002/48] | CPC: |
F23N1/002 (EP,US);
F23N5/24 (KR);
F23N5/242 (EP,US);
F23N5/265 (EP,US);
F23N2223/04 (EP,US);
F23N2223/08 (EP,US);
F23N2223/38 (EP,US);
F23N2223/54 (EP,US);
F23N2225/04 (EP,US);
F23N2225/08 (EP,US);
F23N2227/02 (EP,US);
F23N2227/04 (EP,US);
F23N2227/16 (EP,US);
F23N2231/10 (EP,US);
F23N2231/20 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIAGNOSEGERÄT FÜR FEUERUNGSANLAGE | [2002/48] | English: | FURNACE DIAGNOSTIC SYSTEM | [2002/48] | French: | SYSTEME DE DIAGNOSTIC POUR FOUR | [2002/48] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/48] | 16.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   06.02.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.06.2005 | BE | 08.06.2005 | CH | 08.06.2005 | CY | 08.06.2005 | FI | 08.06.2005 | LI | 08.06.2005 | NL | 08.06.2005 | TR | 08.06.2005 | DK | 08.09.2005 | GR | 08.09.2005 | SE | 08.09.2005 | PT | 14.11.2005 | IE | 24.01.2006 | LU | 31.01.2006 | MC | 31.01.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2007/10] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
BE | 08.06.2005 | ||
CH | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
LI | 08.06.2005 | ||
NL | 08.06.2005 | ||
TR | 08.06.2005 | ||
DK | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
IE | 24.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
BE | 08.06.2005 | ||
CH | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
LI | 08.06.2005 | ||
NL | 08.06.2005 | ||
TR | 08.06.2005 | ||
DK | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
IE | 24.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
BE | 08.06.2005 | ||
CH | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
LI | 08.06.2005 | ||
NL | 08.06.2005 | ||
DK | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
IE | 24.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/44] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
BE | 08.06.2005 | ||
CH | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
LI | 08.06.2005 | ||
NL | 08.06.2005 | ||
DK | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
BE | 08.06.2005 | ||
CH | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
LI | 08.06.2005 | ||
NL | 08.06.2005 | ||
DK | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
BE | 08.06.2005 | ||
CH | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
LI | 08.06.2005 | ||
NL | 08.06.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
BE | 08.06.2005 | ||
CH | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
LI | 08.06.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
BE | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 08.06.2005 | |
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 08.09.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE4036417 (WEBASTO AG FAHRZEUGTECHNIK) [A] * Entire document *; | [Y]US5612904 (BUNTING JOHN E [US]) [Y] 1,2,5-19 * column 2, line 10 - column 3, line 67; figure 10 * * column 5, line 45 - column 5, line 48 * * column 9, line 49 - column 10, line 23 *; | [Y]DE19806112 (EBERSPAECHER J GMBH & CO [DE]) [Y] 1,2,5-19 * column 3, line 42 - column 4, line 25; figure 1 *; | [Y]US6006167 (BUNTING JOHN E [US]) [Y] 1,2,5-19 * column 2, line 9 - column 6, line 55; figure 11 * * column 12, line 8 - column 12, line 54 * |