EP1252723 - SUPPORT OF MULTIUSER DETECTION IN THE DOWNLINK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2005 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTERDIGITAL TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION Suite 527 300 Delaware Avenue Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/44] | For all designated states INTERDIGITAL TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION Suite 527, 300 Delaware Avenue Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZEIRA, Ariela 239 West Neck Road Huntington, NY 11743 / US | 02 /
ZEIRA, Eldad 329 West Neck Road Huntington, NY 11743 / US | 03 /
REZNIK, Alexander 109 Wrangel Court. Apt. 5 Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | 04 /
TERRY, Stephen, E. 15 Summit Avenue North Point, NY 11768 / US | [2003/01] |
Former [2002/44] | 01 /
ZEIRA, Ariela 239 West Neck Road Huntington, NY 11743 / US | ||
02 /
ZEIRA, Eldad 329 West Neck Road Huntington, NY 11743 / US | |||
03 /
REZNIK, Alexander 1 West Drive, Apt. E10 Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | |||
04 /
TERRY, Stephen, E. 15 Summit Avenue North Point, NY 11768 / US | Representative(s) | Henningsson, Gunnar, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/06] | Henningsson, Gunnar, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2002/44] | Frohwitter, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Possartstrasse 20 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01905346.1 | 02.02.2001 | [2002/44] | WO2001US03380 | Priority number, date | US20000180402P | 04.02.2000 Original published format: US 180402 P | [2002/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0158041 | Date: | 09.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1252723 | Date: | 30.10.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1252723 | Date: | 10.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/707 | [2002/44] | CPC: |
H04B1/7103 (EP,US);
H04J13/16 (EP,KR,US);
H04B1/707 (EP,US);
H04B1/7105 (EP,US);
H04J13/00 (EP,US);
H04B1/70735 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UNTERSTÜTZUNG VON ABWÄRTSSTRECKENMEHRBENUTZERDETEKTION | [2002/44] | English: | SUPPORT OF MULTIUSER DETECTION IN THE DOWNLINK | [2002/44] | French: | GESTION DE LA DETECTION DE PLUSIEURS UTILISATEURS AU NIVEAU DE LA LIAISON DESCENDANTE | [2002/44] | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/44] | 18.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04105645.8 Application withdrawn : 10.12.2004 | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.11.2004 | BE | 10.11.2004 | CH | 10.11.2004 | LI | 10.11.2004 | NL | 10.11.2004 | TR | 10.11.2004 | CY | 02.02.2005 | IE | 02.02.2005 | LU | 02.02.2005 | GR | 10.02.2005 | MC | 28.02.2005 | PT | 10.04.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/20] | AT | 10.11.2004 | |
BE | 10.11.2004 | ||
CH | 10.11.2004 | ||
LI | 10.11.2004 | ||
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
TR | 10.11.2004 | ||
CY | 02.02.2005 | ||
IE | 02.02.2005 | ||
LU | 02.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2007/10] | AT | 10.11.2004 | |
BE | 10.11.2004 | ||
CH | 10.11.2004 | ||
LI | 10.11.2004 | ||
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
TR | 10.11.2004 | ||
IE | 02.02.2005 | ||
LU | 02.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 10.11.2004 | |
BE | 10.11.2004 | ||
CH | 10.11.2004 | ||
LI | 10.11.2004 | ||
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
TR | 10.11.2004 | ||
IE | 02.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | AT | 10.11.2004 | |
BE | 10.11.2004 | ||
CH | 10.11.2004 | ||
LI | 10.11.2004 | ||
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
IE | 02.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 10.11.2004 | |
BE | 10.11.2004 | ||
CH | 10.11.2004 | ||
LI | 10.11.2004 | ||
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 10.11.2004 | |
BE | 10.11.2004 | ||
CH | 10.11.2004 | ||
LI | 10.11.2004 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 10.11.2004 | |
CH | 10.11.2004 | ||
LI | 10.11.2004 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | CH | 10.11.2004 | |
LI | 10.11.2004 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/25] | CH | 10.11.2004 | |
LI | 10.11.2004 | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO9940698 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1-6,10-19 * page 2, line 18 - page 4, line 21; figures 1,2 * * page 5, line 14 - page 7, line 11; figure 3; claim 6 * [A] 7-9,20-22; | [A]WO9952249 (MOTOROLA LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1,4,10,18* page 2, line 19 - page 6, line 29; figures 1A-2 *; | [PXA]GB2351422 (ROKE MANOR RESEARCH [GB]) [PX] 1-6,10-19 * page 1, line 21 - page 5, line 3; figure 1 * * page 8, line 17 - page 10, line 2; figure 3; claims 1-9 * [A] 7-9,20-22 |