EP1249154 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING ACCESS TO A COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/42] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAUERWEIN, Rainer Koebkeweg 12 82211 Herrsching / DE | 02 /
PREHOFER, Christian Wengleinstrasse 7 81477 München / DE | 03 /
CHARZINSKI, Joachim Am Glasanger 24 85764 Oberschleissheim / DE | 04 /
ENGEL, Thomas Sonnenweg 61 85579 Unterbiberg / DE | [2002/42] | Application number, filing date | 01905657.1 | 09.01.2001 | [2002/42] | WO2001EP00166 | Priority number, date | EP20000101182 | 21.01.2000 Original published format: EP 00101182 | [2002/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0154448 | Date: | 26.07.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1249154 | Date: | 16.10.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1249154 | Date: | 06.04.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/04 | [2002/42] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0478 (EP,US);
H04L2012/562 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5632 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB [2004/20] |
Former [2002/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ZUGANGSSTEUERUNG EINES KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZES | [2002/42] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING ACCESS TO A COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK | [2002/42] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'ACCES A UN RESEAU DE COMMUNICATION | [2002/42] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/42] | 20.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2322514 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]) [X] 1-8 * figure 3 * * page 8, line 1 - page 9, line 9 *; | [A]EP0957648 (NORTEL NETWORKS CORP [CA]) [A] 1,7 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0020] - [0022] * * paragraphs [0027] , [0028] ** paragraphs [0060] - [0063] *; | [X] - IWATA A ET AL, "PNNI ROUTING ALGORITHMS FOR MULTIMEDIA ATM INTERNET", NEC RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT,JP,NIPPON ELECTRIC LTD. TOKYO, (19970101), vol. 38, no. 1, ISSN 0547-051X, pages 60 - 73, XP000694589 [X] 1-8 * figure 2 * * page 61, column R, line 18 - line 32 * * page 63, column L, line 50 - page 65, column L, line 14 * |