EP1248529 - METHOD AND INSTALLATION FOR CONTINUOUSLY PREPARING CASEINATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2005 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CLEXTRAL 1, rue du Colonel Riez F-42700 Firminy / FR | [2004/50] |
Former [2002/42] | For all designated states CLEXTRAL Tour Framatome, 1 place de la Coupole F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASENSIO, Luis Le Champ Blanc 2, rue Ampère F-42290 Sorbiers / FR | 02 /
BOUVIER, Jean-Marie 5, Place Fourneyron F-42000 Saint-Etienne / FR | 03 /
BRUYAS, Laurent Le Mont Saint Ferréol d'Auroure F-43330 Pont Salomon / FR | 04 /
DURAND, Daniel 26, rue Marcel Rey Le Cadet F-42500 Le Chambon Feugerolles / FR | [2002/49] |
Former [2002/42] | 01 /
ASENSIO, Luis Le Champ Blanc 2, rue Ampère F-42290 Sorbiers / FR | ||
02 /
BOUVIER, Jean-Marie 2, rue Duquesne F-69006 Lyon / FR | |||
03 /
BRUYAS, Laurent Le Mont Saint Ferréol d'Auroure F-43330 Pont Salomon / FR | |||
04 /
DURAND, Daniel 26, rue Marcel Rey Le Cadet F-42500 Le Chambon Feugerolles / FR | Representative(s) | Jacobson, Claude Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/42] | Jacobson, Claude Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 01905857.7 | 16.01.2001 | [2002/42] | WO2001FR00133 | Priority number, date | FR20000000604 | 18.01.2000 Original published format: FR 0000604 | [2002/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0152666 | Date: | 26.07.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1248529 | Date: | 16.10.2002 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1248529 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A23J3/26 | [2002/42] | CPC: |
A23J3/265 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/42] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KONTINUIERLICHEN HERSTELLUNG VON CASEINATEN | [2002/42] | English: | METHOD AND INSTALLATION FOR CONTINUOUSLY PREPARING CASEINATE | [2002/42] | French: | PROCEDE ET INSTALLATION DE PREPARATION EN CONTINU DE CASEINATE | [2002/42] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/42] | 23.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.01.2005 | FI | 05.01.2005 | IT | 05.01.2005 | TR | 05.01.2005 | CY | 16.01.2005 | LU | 16.01.2005 | BE | 31.01.2005 | MC | 31.01.2005 | GR | 05.04.2005 | SE | 05.04.2005 | ES | 16.04.2005 | PT | 05.06.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/36] | AT | 05.01.2005 | |
FI | 05.01.2005 | ||
IT | 05.01.2005 | ||
TR | 05.01.2005 | ||
CY | 16.01.2005 | ||
LU | 16.01.2005 | ||
BE | 31.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
GR | 05.04.2005 | ||
SE | 05.04.2005 | ||
ES | 16.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 05.01.2005 | |
FI | 05.01.2005 | ||
TR | 05.01.2005 | ||
CY | 16.01.2005 | ||
LU | 16.01.2005 | ||
BE | 31.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
GR | 05.04.2005 | ||
SE | 05.04.2005 | ||
ES | 16.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/10] | AT | 05.01.2005 | |
FI | 05.01.2005 | ||
TR | 05.01.2005 | ||
LU | 16.01.2005 | ||
BE | 31.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
GR | 05.04.2005 | ||
SE | 05.04.2005 | ||
ES | 16.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 05.01.2005 | |
FI | 05.01.2005 | ||
TR | 05.01.2005 | ||
BE | 31.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
GR | 05.04.2005 | ||
SE | 05.04.2005 | ||
ES | 16.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 05.01.2005 | |
FI | 05.01.2005 | ||
BE | 31.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
GR | 05.04.2005 | ||
SE | 05.04.2005 | ||
ES | 16.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 05.01.2005 | |
FI | 05.01.2005 | ||
BE | 31.01.2005 | ||
SE | 05.04.2005 | ||
ES | 16.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 05.01.2005 | |
FI | 05.01.2005 | ||
SE | 05.04.2005 | ||
ES | 16.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 05.01.2005 | |
FI | 05.01.2005 | ||
SE | 05.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/48] | FI | 05.01.2005 | |
SE | 05.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 05.01.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1433842 (QUAKER OATS CO); | [A]FR2459005 (BEL FROMAGERIES) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [A]GB2148902 (WERNER & PFLEIDERER) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4839193 (MANGE CHRISTIAN [FR], et al) [A] 4-8 * column 4, line 10 - column 6, line 45 *; | [A]EP0340396 (WERNER & PFLEIDERER [DE]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A] - FICHTALI J ET AL, "PILOT PLANT PRODUCTION OF CASEINS USING EXTRUSION PROCESSING. ÖII. SODIUM CASEINATE PRODUCTION", MILCHWISSENSCHAFT,DE,VV GMBH VOLKSWIRTSCHAFTLICHER VERLAG. MUNCHEN, (1991), vol. 46, no. 8, ISSN 0026-3788, pages 479 - 483, XP000226136 [A] 1-8 * page 480, paragraph 2.1; figure 1 * | [A] - SZPENDOWSKI J ET AL, "THE EFFECT OF EXTRUSION ON THE BIOLOGICAL VALUE OF CASEINATES", MILCHWISSENSCHAFT,DE,VV GMBH VOLKSWIRTSCHAFTLICHER VERLAG. MUNCHEN, (1994), vol. 49, no. 5, ISSN 0026-3788, pages 260 - 263, XP000454659 [A] 1,4 * page 260, paragraph 2.1 * | [A] - WAGNER ET AL., "Making caseinate by extruder", FOOD ENGINEERING INTERNATIONAL, (1989), vol. 14, no. 2, pages 42 - 45, XP000957814 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * |