EP1256187 - METHOD FOR FREQUENCY OFFSET ESTIMATION IN A DIRECT SEQUENCE SPREAD SPECTRUM COMMUNICATIONS RECEIVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 101-8001 / JP | ||
Former [2002/46] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 33-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOLOORIAN, Majid 530 2nd Avenue, 217 Kirkland, Washington 98033 / US | [2002/46] | Representative(s) | von Samson-Himmelstjerna, Friedrich, et al Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/46] | von Samson-Himmelstjerna, Friedrich R., Dipl.-Phys., et al SAMSON & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01906134.0 | 19.02.2001 | [2002/46] | WO2001JP01157 | Priority number, date | GB20000003859 | 19.02.2000 Original published format: GB 0003859 | [2002/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0161880 | Date: | 23.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1256187 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1256187 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/707, H04B7/26 | [2002/46] | CPC: |
H04L27/0014 (EP,US);
H04B1/7075 (EP,US);
H04B1/707 (EP,US);
H04L2027/0065 (EP,US);
H04L2027/0095 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2002/46] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR FREQUENZABLAGESCHÄTZUNG IN EINEM DIREKTSEQUENZSPREIZSPEKTRUMEMPFÄNGER | [2002/46] | English: | METHOD FOR FREQUENCY OFFSET ESTIMATION IN A DIRECT SEQUENCE SPREAD SPECTRUM COMMUNICATIONS RECEIVER | [2002/46] | French: | PROCEDE D'EVALUATION DU GLISSEMENT DE FREQUENCE DANS UN RECEPTEUR DE COMMUNICATIONS A ETALEMENT DU SPECTRE EN SEQUENCE DIRECTE | [2002/46] | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 20.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/46] | 04.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO9966649 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [X] 1-3 * page 5, line 5 - page 6, line 20 * * page 12, line 28 - page 16, line 8; figures 3,4 * * page 23, line 11 - page 25, line 2; figure 9; claims 1-8 * [A] 4; | [XA]GB2287613 (ROKE MANOR RESEARCH [GB]) [X] 1-3 * page 3, line 19 - line 42 * * page 5, line 10 - page 6, line 48; figure 3; claims 12-21,28 * [A] 4; | [XA]EP0892528 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [X] 1 * page 2, line 5 - line 20 * * page 5, line 9 - page 6, line 14; figures 2,3; claims 1-3 * [A] 2-4 |