EP1292752 - VEHICLE WINDOW GLASS HOLDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.01.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.03.2006 [2006/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd. 7-28, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | For all designated states NIFCO INC. 184-1 Maioka-cho, Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa, 244-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/12] | For all designated states Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd. 7-28, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | ||
For all designated states NIFCO INC. 184-1 Maioka-cho, Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa, 244-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANATANI, Yasukazu Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd. 4-7-28, Kitahama Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | 02 /
MAGARA, Katsumi Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd. 4-7-28, Kitahama Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | 03 /
OGAWA, Atsushi Nifco Inc. 184-1, Maioka Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi 244-8522 / JP | [2003/12] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/12] | Wilson Gunn M'Caw 41-51 Royal Exchange, Cross Street Manchester M2 7BD / GB | Application number, filing date | 01906197.7 | 22.02.2001 | [2003/12] | WO2001JP01286 | Priority number, date | JP20000182859 | 19.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000182859 | [2003/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0198614 | Date: | 27.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1292752 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E05F11/38 | [2003/12] | CPC: |
E05F11/385 (EP,US);
E05F2011/387 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/55 (EP,US);
F16B2005/0671 (EP,US);
Y10T403/535 (EP,US);
Y10T403/7005 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/21] |
Former [2003/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEFESTIGUNGSANORDNUNG FÜR DIE SCHEIBE EINES KRAFTWAGENS | [2003/12] | English: | VEHICLE WINDOW GLASS HOLDER | [2003/12] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION D'UNE VITRE DE VEHICULE | [2003/12] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.09.2002 | Examination requested [2003/12] | 19.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/10] | 06.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE3535719 (AUDI AG) [X] 1-3,6,7 * column 5, line 34 - column 5, line 50 * * column 5, line 61 - column 6, line 45 * * abstract * [Y] 11,12; | [Y]US4943179 (HORIKI YOSHIO [JP], et al) [Y] 11,12 * column 4, line 11 - column 4, line 21 * * abstract *; | [A]JPH08177307 ; | [A]JPS646486 (KANTO JIDOSHA KOGYO KK) [A] 10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961129), vol. 1996, no. 11, & JP08177307 A 19960709 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [A] 11,12 * abstract * | by applicant | JPS5438648U |