EP1272126 - STENT SECUREMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Scimed, Inc. One Scimed Place Maple Grove, MN 55311 / US | [2005/51] |
Former [2003/02] | For all designated states Scimed Life Systems, Inc. One Scimed Place Maple Grove, Minnesota 55311-1566 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GERBERDING, Brent, C. 2524 Central Avenue Alameda, CA 94538 / US | 02 /
HOLTAN, David, J. 5175 Nellmark Avenue Rogers, MN 55374 / US | 03 /
HANSON, Scott, M. 14802 Yosemite Avenue South Savage, MN 55378 / US | [2003/02] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/15] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2003/02] | Graalfs, Edo, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Hauck, Graalfs, Wehnert Döring, Siemons, Schildberg Neuer Wall 41 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 01906875.8 | 01.02.2001 | [2003/02] | WO2001US03317 | Priority number, date | US20000549286 | 14.04.2000 Original published format: US 549286 | [2003/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0178628 | Date: | 25.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1272126 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1272126 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/84 | [2007/32] | CPC: |
A61F2/958 (EP,US);
A61F2002/9583 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/02] | A61F2/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/02] | Title | German: | STENTBEFESTIGUNGSSYSTEM | [2003/02] | English: | STENT SECUREMENT SYSTEM | [2003/02] | French: | SYSTEME DE POSE D'ENDOPROTHESE | [2003/02] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/02] | 19.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 21.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.07.2007 | 03.07.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 09.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.03.2008 | CY | 26.03.2008 | DK | 26.03.2008 | FI | 26.03.2008 | TR | 26.03.2008 | SE | 26.06.2008 | GR | 27.06.2008 | PT | 01.09.2008 | [2011/43] |
Former [2010/47] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
CY | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
GR | 27.06.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/42] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
CY | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
FI | 26.03.2008 | Cited in | International search | [XAY]WO9631249 (SOLAR RITA & GATERUD LTD [US]) [X] 1-5,8,12,18 * figures 4B-C * * page 11, line 11 - page 13, line 20 * [A] 19 [Y] 6,11; | [A]US5980530 (WILLARD MARTIN R [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * figures 1-4 ** column 3, line 35 - column 4, line 32 *; | [PYA]WO0076425 (SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [PY] 6,11 * page 8, line 18 - line 21 * [A] 18,19 | Examination | US5108416 | EP1537837 | by applicant | US4950227 | US5108416 | US5403341 |