EP1263452 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR GENERATING ANGIOSTATIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Northwestern University 1880 Oak Street, Suite 100 Evanston, IL 60201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/50] | For all designated states Northwestern University 1880 Oak Street, Suite 100 Evanston, IL 60201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOFF, Gerald 8651 North Kedvale Skokie, IL 60076 / US | 02 /
GATELY, Stephen, T. 357 East Shady Pines Court Palatine, IL 60067 / US | 03 /
TWARDOWSKI, Przemyslaw City of Hope Medical Center, 131 Holly Street, 110 Pasadena, CA 91103 / US | [2007/32] |
Former [2003/12] | 01 /
SOFF, Gerald 8651 North Kedvale Skokie, IL 60076 / US | ||
02 /
GATELY, Stephen, T. 357 East Shady Pines Court Palatine, IL 60067 / US | |||
03 /
TWARDOWSKI, Przemyslaw City of Hope Medical Center, 131 Holly Street,#110 Pasadena, CA 91103 / US | |||
Former [2002/50] | 01 /
SOFF, Gerald 8651 North Kedvale Skokie, IL 60076 / US | ||
02 /
GATELY, Stephen, T. 357 East Shady Pines Court Palatine, IL 60067 / US | |||
03 /
TWARDOWSKI, Przemyslaw 131 Holly Street, Apartment 110 Pasadena, CA 91103 / US | Representative(s) | Schüssler, Andrea Kanzlei Huber & Schüssler Truderinger Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/50] | Schüssler, Andrea, Dr. Kanzlei Huber & Schüssler Truderinger Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01907105.9 | 08.02.2001 | [2002/50] | WO2001US04021 | Priority number, date | US20000500397 | 08.02.2000 Original published format: US 500397 | [2002/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0158921 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1263452 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.02.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/00, C07K14/00 | [2002/50] | CPC: |
G01N33/573 (EP);
A61K31/198 (EP);
A61K31/401 (EP);
A61K38/164 (EP);
A61K38/166 (EP);
A61K38/484 (EP);
A61K38/49 (EP);
A61K38/51 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C07K16/40 (EP);
C12N9/6435 (EP);
C12Y304/21007 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K38/164, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K38/164, A61K31/195 (EP);
A61K38/164, A61K31/40 (EP);
A61K38/164, A61K38/063 (EP);
A61K38/166, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K38/484, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K38/484, A61K38/164, A61K31/195 (EP);
A61K38/484, A61K38/164, A61K31/40 (EP);
A61K38/484, A61K38/164, A61K38/063 (EP);
A61K38/49, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K38/51, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K38/51, A61K38/484, A61K31/195 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ANGIOSTATIN | [2002/50] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR GENERATING ANGIOSTATIN | [2002/50] | French: | PROCEDES ET COMPOSITIONS PERMETTANT DE PRODUIRE DE L'ANGIOSTATINE | [2002/50] | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.2002 | Search fee paid | 06.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 06.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/50] | 26.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/53] | 22.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2009 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9815574 (UNIV NORTHWESTERN [US], et al) [X] 1-58 * page 4, line 3 - line 6 * * page 21, line 32 - page 22, line 7 * * claim - *; | [A]EP0366033 (SQUIBB & SONS INC [US]); | [A]WO8803030 (MOSCATELLI DAVID A [US], et al) | [A] - VOLPERT O V ET AL, "Captopril inhibits angiogenesis and slows the growth of experimental tumors in rats", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19960801), vol. 98, no. 3, ISSN 0021-9738, pages 671 - 679, XP002223374 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI118838 | [A] - HOURANI B T ET AL, "INHIBITION OF S-91 MOUSE MELANOMA METASTASES AND GROWTH BY D-PENICILLAMINE", LABORATORY INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES AND CANADIAN ACADEMY OF PATHOLOGY, BALTIMORE,, US, (1969), vol. 21, no. 5, ISSN 0023-6837, pages 434 - 438, XP008010946 | [A] - FRIESS ET AL, "Enhanced urokinase plasminogen activation in chronic pancreatitis suggests a role in its pathogenesis", GASTROENTEROLOGY, ELSEVIER, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (199709), vol. 113, no. 3, ISSN 0016-5085, pages 904 - 913, XP005688578 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0016-5085(97)70186-0 | International search | [X] - KOCH ET AL., "Thiol-containing compounds inhibit the production of monocyte/macrophage-derived angiogenic activity", AGENTS AND ACTIONS, (1991), vol. 34, no. 3/4, pages 350 - 357, XP002947087 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01988728 | [A] - BERMAN ET AL., "Plasminogen activator (urokinase) causes vascularization of the cornea", INVEST. OPHTHALMOL. VIS. SCI., (198210), vol. 22, pages 191 - 199, XP002947088 |