EP1259679 - ANCHORING FOR A PRE-TENSIONED AND/OR LOADED STRENGTH MEMBER AND ANCHOR SLEEVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2007 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kollegger, Johann Kohlenstrasse 53 34121 Kassel / DE | [2002/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/48] | Representative(s) | Widtmann, Georg, et al Clusiusgasse 2/8 1090 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/48] | Widtmann, Georg, Dipl.-Ing. Dr. techn., et al Clusiusgasse 2/8 1090 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 01907227.1 | 21.02.2001 | [2002/48] | WO2001AT00043 | Priority number, date | DE2000110564 | 03.03.2000 Original published format: DE 10010564 | [2002/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0165023 | Date: | 07.09.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1259679 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1259679 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E04C5/12, E04C5/07 | [2002/48] | CPC: |
E04C5/127 (EP);
E04C5/07 (EP);
E04C5/122 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 06.09.2002 | LV | 06.09.2002 | MK | 06.09.2002 | RO | Not yet paid | SI | 06.09.2002 | Title | German: | VERANKERUNG FÜR EIN VORGESPANNTES UND/ODER BELASTETES ZUGELEMENT UND ANKERBÜCHSE | [2002/48] | English: | ANCHORING FOR A PRE-TENSIONED AND/OR LOADED STRENGTH MEMBER AND ANCHOR SLEEVE | [2002/48] | French: | ANCRAGE POUR ELEMENT DE TRACTION PRECONTRAINT ET/OU CHARGE ET BOITE D'ANCRAGE | [2002/48] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/48] | 04.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 28.06.2006 | FI | 28.06.2006 | FR | 28.06.2006 | GB | 28.06.2006 | IE | 28.06.2006 | IT | 28.06.2006 | NL | 28.06.2006 | TR | 28.06.2006 | DK | 28.09.2006 | SE | 28.09.2006 | GR | 29.09.2006 | ES | 09.10.2006 | PT | 28.11.2006 | LU | 21.02.2007 | BE | 28.02.2007 | CH | 28.02.2007 | LI | 28.02.2007 | MC | 28.02.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | CY | 28.06.2006 | |
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
FR | 28.06.2006 | ||
GB | 28.06.2006 | ||
IE | 28.06.2006 | ||
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
GR | 29.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
LU | 21.02.2007 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2009/01] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
FR | 28.06.2006 | ||
GB | 28.06.2006 | ||
IE | 28.06.2006 | ||
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
GR | 29.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
GB | 28.06.2006 | ||
IE | 28.06.2006 | ||
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
GR | 29.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
GB | 28.06.2006 | ||
IE | 28.06.2006 | ||
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
GB | 28.06.2006 | ||
IE | 28.06.2006 | ||
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
GB | 28.06.2006 | ||
IE | 28.06.2006 | ||
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
GB | 28.06.2006 | ||
IE | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
IE | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 28.09.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3099109 (VOLKER HAHN) [A] 1 * column 2, line 50 - column 2, line 57 ** figure 5 *; | [A]DE2705483 (BAYER AG, et al) [A] 1 * figures 5,7,9,14,16; claims 1,2,5-7 *; | [A]EP0554161 (SIF ENTREPRISE [FR]) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 * | by applicant | WO9529308 |