EP1248888 - SYSTEM FOR CONNECTING ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.01.2009 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.02.2009 [2009/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states van der Heijden, Franciscus Antonius Maria Grotenhout 2 2275 Lille / BE | [2002/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/42] | Representative(s) | Bleukx, Lucas Lodewijk M. Bleukx Consultancy BVBA Derde Straat 7 3680 Maaseik / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Bleukx, Lucas Lodewijk M. Bleukx Consultancy BVBA Derde Straat 7 3680 Maaseik / BE | ||
Former [2002/42] | Bleukx, Lucas Lodewijk M. Hydro S.A. Avenue Marcel Thiry 83 1200 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 01907472.3 | 17.01.2001 | [2002/42] | WO2001EP00616 | Priority number, date | NL20001014082 | 17.01.2000 Original published format: NL 1014082 | [2002/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0153622 | Date: | 26.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1248888 | Date: | 16.10.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E04B2/08, F16B21/08, F16B37/08, F16B37/12 | [2002/42] | CPC: |
F16B37/0842 (EP,US);
F16B37/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERBINDEN VON ELEMENTEN | [2002/42] | English: | SYSTEM FOR CONNECTING ELEMENTS | [2002/42] | French: | SYSTEME DESTINE A RELIER DES ELEMENTS | [2002/42] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/42] | 01.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/08] | 02.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2004 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   05.03.2004 | 31.01.2007 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   22.03.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DYA]WO9848126 (HEIJDEN FRANCISCUS ANTONIUS MA [BE]) [DY] 1-4,6,7,13-15,17 * page 4, paragraph 22 - page 5, paragraph 7 * * figures 3,4 * [A] 8; | [Y]FR912009 (A. BUELER) [Y] 1-4,6,7,13-15,17 * page 1, lines 18-34 * * page 2, lines 11-18 * * figures 1,2,4,6,8 *; | [A]US5868537 (LATAL JAMES F [US], et al) [A] 1-3,17 * claim 8 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US3466966 (BROWN MARTIN M) [A] 1,6,17 * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 33 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2390514 (CRAM HARKNESS W) [A] 9-12 * column 2, lines 6-14 * * column 2, lines 43-53 * * figures 1,4-6 *; | [A]US2566593 (SAMUEL BLOOMFIELD) [A] 16 * column 2, lines 6-11 * * figures 3,5 * | by applicant | WO9848126 |