EP1268664 - THERMOPLASTIC MOULDING MATERIALS BASED ON SPECIAL GRAFT RUBBER COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ineos ABS (Jersey) Limited Whiteley Chambers Don Street St Helier Jersey JE4 9WG Channel Islands / GB | [2009/18] |
Former [2005/30] | For all designated states LANXESS Deutschland GmbH 51369 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states Bayer Aktiengesellschaft 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUN, Liqing-Lee 113 Donegal Drive Granville, OH 43023 / US | 02 /
WENZ, Eckhard Suevenstr. 5 50679 Köln / DE | 03 /
EICHENAUER, Herbert Gustav-Heinemann-Str. 3 41539 Dormagen / DE | 04 /
MOSS, Stefan August-Macke-Weg 3 42781 Haan / DE | 05 /
ALBERTS, Heinrich Schulstr. 1a 51519 Odenthal / DE | 06 /
HAUERTMANN, Hans-Bernhard Kornblumenweg 1 41539 Dormagen / DE | 07 /
ZABROCKI, Karl Edelfalter 33 41564 Kaarst / DE | 08 /
GASCHE, Hans-Erich Via Frizzoni 28 I-24121 Bergamo / IT | 09 /
JANSEN, Ulrich Stürzelberger Str. 50 41541 Dormagen / DE | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Postfach 18 04 09 40571 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/15] | Gille Hrabal Postfach 18 04 09 40571 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2009/08] | Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Postfach 18 04 09 40571 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 01907570.4 | 26.02.2001 | [2003/01] | WO2001EP02217 | Priority number, date | DE20001011544 | 09.03.2000 Original published format: DE 10011544 | [2003/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0166641 | Date: | 13.09.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1268664 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1268664 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C08L55/02, C08F279/02, C08F279/04, C08L51/04 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
C08L51/04 (EP,KR,US);
C08F279/02 (EP,US);
C08F279/04 (EP,US);
C08L55/02 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L51/04, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L51/04, C08L2666/14 (EP,US);
C08L55/02, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L55/02, C08L2666/14 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2016/15] |
Former [2003/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | THERMOPLASTISCHE FORMMASSEN AUF BASIS SPEZIELLER PFROPFKAUTSCHUKKOMPONENTEN | [2003/01] | English: | THERMOPLASTIC MOULDING MATERIALS BASED ON SPECIAL GRAFT RUBBER COMPONENTS | [2003/01] | French: | MATIERES MOULABLES THERMOPLASTIQUES A BASE DE COMPOSANTS SPECIAUX DE CAOUTCHOUC GREFFE | [2003/01] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 03.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.11.2003 | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 13.04.2016 | DK | 13.04.2016 | FI | 13.04.2016 | IT | 13.04.2016 | MC | 13.04.2016 | NL | 13.04.2016 | SE | 13.04.2016 | TR | 13.04.2016 | GR | 14.07.2016 | PT | 16.08.2016 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | CY | 13.04.2016 | |
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | DK | 13.04.2016 | |
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 13.04.2016 | |
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | FI | 13.04.2016 | |
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 13.04.2016 | |
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 13.04.2016 | |
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 13.04.2016 | |
NL | 13.04.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XY]GB1009655 (BAYER AG) [X] 1-11,13-16 * Beispiel 1 ; Tabellen 1-4 ; Ansprüche 1-3 ; Seite 2, Zeile 33-40 ; Seite 2, Zeile 56-67 ; Seite 1, Zeile 42-72 ; Seite 3, Zeile 16-29 *; page 3, lines 65-74 * [Y] 12; | [Y]US3532660 (OTT KARL-HEINZ, et al) [Y] 1-16 * Ansprüche 1-6 *; column 5, lines 22-27 *; | [Y]CH499558 (BAYER AG [DE]) [Y] 1-16 * Spalte 2, Zeile 21 - Spalte 3, Zeile 31*; column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 2 *; | [DA]DE2101650 (INT SYNTHETIC RUBBER) [DA] 1-16* abstract *; | [DA]EP0540470 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [DA] 1-16 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0745624 (BAYER AG [DE]) [Y] 1-16 * Ansprüche 1-6 *;; examples 1-5 *; | [Y]US5883189 (EICHENAUER HERBERT [DE], et al) [Y] 1-16 * Beispiele *;; claims 1-6 *; | [Y]WO0004067 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [Y] 12 * Ansprüche 10, 1-13 * |