EP1272999 - DISPLAY DEVICE HAVING CURRENT-ADDRESSED PIXELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.02.2011 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.03.2011 [2011/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/02] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUNTER, Iain, M. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
BIRD, Neil, C. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2003/02] | Representative(s) | Damen, Daniel Martijn, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/01] | Damen, Daniel Martijn, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2003/02] | Williamson, Paul Lewis Philips Corporate Intellectual Property, Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01907572.0 | 27.02.2001 | [2003/02] | WO2001EP02231 | Priority number, date | GB20000008019 | 31.03.2000 Original published format: GB 0008019 | [2003/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0175852 | Date: | 11.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1272999 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/32 | [2003/02] | CPC: |
G09G3/325 (EP,US);
G09G3/30 (KR);
G09G3/3283 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0809 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0842 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0861 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0233 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/02] | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG MIT STROMGESTEUERTEN BILDPUNKTEN | [2003/02] | English: | DISPLAY DEVICE HAVING CURRENT-ADDRESSED PIXELS | [2003/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE AVEC PIXELS PILOTES PAR COURANT | [2003/02] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/02] | 13.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/11] | 07.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/11] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 13.03.2009 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2010 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0766221 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,8 * column 3, line 47 - column 5, line 28 *; | [A]US5952789 (STEWART ROGER GREEN [US], et al) [A] 1,8,9* column 3, line 8 - column 7, line 9 * | by applicant | EP0653741 | EP0766221 |