EP1177561 - TELECOMMUNICATION CABLE, AND IN PARTICULAR SELF-SUPPORTED SUBSCRIBER CONNECTION CABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2005 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Acome Société Cooperative De Travailleurs 14, rue de Marignan 75008 Paris / FR | [2002/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOBLOT, Jean-Yves 15 Bis, rue de Versailles F-50140 Mortain / FR | 02 /
TRANCHANT, Alain Courbocé F-50140 Bion / FR | [2002/06] | Representative(s) | Callon de Lamarck, Jean-Robert, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20 Rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/06] | Callon de Lamarck, Jean-Robert, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 01907752.8 | 09.02.2001 | [2002/06] | WO2001FR00386 | Priority number, date | FR20000001728 | 11.02.2000 Original published format: FR 0001728 | [2002/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0159792 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1177561 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1177561 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01B7/08, H01B7/18 | [2002/06] | CPC: |
H01B7/0869 (EP);
H01B7/183 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/42] |
Former [2002/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NACHRICHTENKABEL, INSBESONDERE TEILNEHMERANSCHLUSSKABEL SELBSTTRAGENDEN TYPS | [2002/06] | English: | TELECOMMUNICATION CABLE, AND IN PARTICULAR SELF-SUPPORTED SUBSCRIBER CONNECTION CABLE | [2002/06] | French: | CABLE DE TELECOMMUNICATION, ET NOTAMMENT CABLE DE RACCORDEMENT D'ABONNE, DE TYPE AUTOPORTE | [2002/06] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/14] | 21.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.10.2004 | FI | 13.10.2004 | NL | 13.10.2004 | DK | 13.01.2005 | GR | 13.01.2005 | SE | 13.01.2005 | DE | 14.01.2005 | CY | 09.02.2005 | [2007/20] |
Former [2007/10] | AT | 13.10.2004 | |
FI | 13.10.2004 | ||
NL | 13.10.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
SE | 13.01.2005 | ||
DE | 14.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 13.10.2004 | |
FI | 13.10.2004 | ||
NL | 13.10.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
DE | 14.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 13.10.2004 | |
FI | 13.10.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 13.10.2004 | |
FI | 13.10.2004 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 13.10.2004 | |
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 13.10.2004 | Cited in | International search | [AD]US4761053 (COGELIA NICHOLAS J [US], et al) [AD] 1-4,6,8,9,13 * column 4, line 17 - line 48 * * column 8, line 10 - column 9, line 9; figures 14,15,17 *; | [AD]EP0468689 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [AD] 1-4,13* column 3, line 37 - column 10, line 5; figures 1-5 * |