EP1259615 - ANTIBODIES AGAINST EOTAXIN AND THEIR USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/48] | HUMAN ANTIBODIES AGAINST EOTAXIN AND THEIR USE | ||
[2008/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2009 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MedImmune Limited Milstein Building Granta Park Cambridge CB21 6GH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/19] | For all designated states MedImmune Limited Milstein Building Granta Park Cambridge CB1 6GH / GB | ||
Former [2008/46] | For all designated states CAMBRIDGE ANTIBODY TECHNOLOGY LIMITED Milstein Building Granta Park Cambridge CB1 6GH / GB | ||
Former [2004/40] | For all designated states Cambridge Antibody Technology Limited Milstein Building Granta Park Cambridge CB1 6GH / GB | ||
Former [2002/48] | For all designated states Cambridge Antibody Technology Limited The Science Park, Melbourne Royston, Cambridgeshire SG8 6JJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAUGHAN, Tristan, J. 25 Coppice Avenue Great Shelford Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB2 5QA / GB | 02 /
WILTON, Alison, Jane 46 Huntingdon Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB3 0HH / GB | 03 /
SMITH, Stephen 33 Church Road Wicken Ely, Cambridgeshire CB7 5XT / GB | 04 /
MAIN, Sarah, Helen 5 Church Close Bassingbourn, Royston SG8 5NW / GB | [2002/48] | Representative(s) | Sutcliffe, Nicholas Robert, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/48] | Sutcliffe, Nicholas Robert, et al Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 01907990.4 | 02.03.2001 | [2002/48] | WO2001GB00927 | Priority number, date | US20000187246P | 03.03.2000 Original published format: US 187246 P | [2002/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0166754 | Date: | 13.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1259615 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1259615 | Date: | 12.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/13, C12N15/62, C12N5/10, C07K16/24, // A61K39/395, G01N33/574, G01N33/68 | [2008/19] | CPC: |
C07K16/24 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
C12P21/00 (US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
C07K2317/565 (EP,US);
C07K2317/622 (EP,US);
C07K2317/76 (US);
|
Former IPC [2002/48] | C12N15/13, C12N15/62, C12N5/10, C07K16/24, // (A61K39/395, G01N33:577, 33:68) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTIKÖRPER GEGEN EOTAXIN UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2008/19] | English: | ANTIBODIES AGAINST EOTAXIN AND THEIR USE | [2008/19] | French: | ANTICORPS CONTRE L'EOTAXINE ET UTILISATION ASSOCIEE | [2008/19] |
Former [2002/48] | HUMAN ANTIKÖRPER GEGEN EOTAXIN UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | ||
Former [2002/48] | HUMAN ANTIBODIES AGAINST EOTAXIN AND THEIR USE | ||
Former [2002/48] | ANTICORPS HUMAINS CONTRE L'EOTAXINE ET UTILISATION ASSOCIEE | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/48] | 30.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.02.2008 | 22.02.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 27.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 28.02.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.02.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 03.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/42] | Request for further processing for: | 31.03.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 29.03.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.04.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.11.2008 | BE | 12.11.2008 | CY | 12.11.2008 | DK | 12.11.2008 | FI | 12.11.2008 | IT | 12.11.2008 | NL | 12.11.2008 | TR | 12.11.2008 | SE | 12.02.2009 | GR | 13.02.2009 | ES | 23.02.2009 | GB | 02.03.2009 | LU | 02.03.2009 | MC | 31.03.2009 | PT | 13.04.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
BE | 12.11.2008 | ||
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IT | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
GR | 13.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
GB | 02.03.2009 | ||
LU | 02.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
BE | 12.11.2008 | ||
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IT | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
GR | 13.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
GB | 02.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
BE | 12.11.2008 | ||
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
GR | 13.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
GB | 02.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
BE | 12.11.2008 | ||
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
GB | 02.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
BE | 12.11.2008 | ||
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/37] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
BE | 12.11.2008 | ||
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
BE | 12.11.2008 | ||
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
BE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 23.02.2009 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9712914 ; | [Y]WO9910534 (BLOOD RES CENTER [US]) [Y] 1-29 * page 15, lines 10-18; example 5 *; | [Y]US5993814 (WILLIAMS TIMOTHY J [GB], et al) [Y] 1-29 * column 4, lines 1-29 * * column 6, lines 1-37 *; | [Y] - GARCIA-ZEPEDA E A ET AL, "Human eotaxin is a specific chemoattractant for eosinophil cells and provides a new mechanism to explain tissue eosinophilia", NATURE MEDICINE,US,NATURE PUBLISHING, CO, (19960401), vol. 2, no. 4, ISSN 1078-8956, pages 449 - 456, XP000609095 [Y] 1-29 * abstract * * figure 1 * * page 451, column 1, paragraph L - column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 453, column 2, paragraph L - page 454, column 2, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm0496-449 | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 20, Database accession no. 1997-226168, XP002167843 & WO9712914 A 00000000 ((SHIO) SHIONOGI & CO LTD) [Y] 1-29 * abstract * | Examination | - J. GONZALO ET AL., "Eosinophil recruitment to the lung in a murine model of allergic inflammation.", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, (199611), vol. 98, no. 10, pages 2332 - 2345 | - H. GRAM ET AL., "In vitro selection and affinity maturation of antibodies from a naive combinatorial immunoglobulin library.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE U.S.A., Washington, DC, USA, (19920415), vol. 89, no. 8, pages 3576 - 3580, XP002912512 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.89.8.3576 | - J. MARKS ET AL., "By-passing immunization: Building high affinity human antibodies by chain shuffling.", BIO/TECHNOLOGY, New York, NY, USA, (199207), vol. 10, no. 7, pages 779 - 783, XP002917376 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0792-779 |