EP1262058 - PORTABLE INFORMATION TERMINAL AND DIGITAL CAMERA THEREFOR, AND PORTABLE DIGITAL CAMERA INFORMATION TERMINAL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.04.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.05.2009 [2009/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KYOCERA CORPORATION 6, Takeda Tobadono-cho, Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | For all designated states DDI Pocket, Inc. 3-4-7. Toranomon, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-847 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Kyocera Corporation 6, Takeda Tobadono-cho, Fushimi-ku Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | ||
For all designated states DDI Pocket, Inc. 3-4-7. Toranomon, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-847 / JP | |||
Former [2002/49] | For all designated states Kyocera Corporation 6, Takeda Tobadono-cho, Fushimi-ku Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | ||
For all designated states KDDI Corporation 3-2, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-8003 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ODAGIRI, Kenji Kyocera Corporation Yohga Office 14-9, Tamagawadai 2-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo 158-8610 / JP | 02 /
KITA, Katsuya DDI POCKET, Inc. 3-5-1, Toranomon Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8477 / JP | 03 /
YAMASHITA, Kenichi DDI POCKET, Inc. 3-5-1, Toranomon Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8477 / JP | 04 /
ISHIKAWA, Shunji DDI POCKET, Inc. 3-5-1, Toranomon Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8477 / JP | 05 /
KAMIJO, Tetsuya DDI POCKET, Inc. 3-5-1, Toranomon Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8477 / JP | 06 /
HONDA, Susumu DDI POCKET, Inc. 3-5-1, Toranomon Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8477 / JP | 07 /
IWASHIGE, Tomoya DDI POCKET, Inc. 3-5-1, Toranomon Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8477 / JP | 08 /
SUNAGA, Yasuhiro DDI POCKET, Inc. 3-5-1, Toranomon Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8477 / JP | 09 /
OISHI, Hirofumi DDI POCKET, Inc. 3-5-1, Toranomon Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8477 / JP | 10 /
BEPPU, Shigeyuki Kyocera Corp. YokohamaOffice 2-1 -1, Kagahara Tsuzuki Yokohama Kanagawa 224-0502 / JP | 11 /
SOMEI, Yasunobu Kyocera Corp. YokohamaOffice 2-1 -1, Kagahara Tsuzuki Yokohama Kanagawa 224-0502 / JP | [2002/49] | Representative(s) | Loisel, Bertrand Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | Loisel, Bertrand Cabinet Plasseraud, 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75440 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 01908136.3 | 28.02.2001 | [2002/49] | WO2001JP01497 | Priority number, date | JP20000053113 | 29.02.2000 Original published format: JP 2000053113 | JP20000155390 | 25.05.2000 Original published format: JP 2000155390 | JP20000333948 | 31.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000333948 | JP20000333950 | 31.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000333950 | JP20000333951 | 31.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000333951 | JP20010003533 | 11.01.2001 Original published format: JP 2001003533 | [2002/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0165827 | Date: | 07.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1262058 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/00 | [2002/49] | CPC: |
H04M1/0264 (EP,US);
G06F1/1632 (EP,US);
H04M1/72409 (EP,US);
H04N1/00127 (EP,US);
H04N23/54 (EP,US);
H04N23/55 (EP,US);
H04M1/0254 (EP,US);
H04M1/6058 (EP,US);
H04N1/00204 (EP,US);
H04N1/00281 (EP,US);
H04N1/00307 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0034 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRAGBARES INFORMATIONSENDGERÄT UND DIGITALE KAMERA DAFÜR, UND TRAGBARES DIGITALKAMERA-INFORMATIONSENDGERÄTSYSTEM | [2002/49] | English: | PORTABLE INFORMATION TERMINAL AND DIGITAL CAMERA THEREFOR, AND PORTABLE DIGITAL CAMERA INFORMATION TERMINAL SYSTEM | [2002/49] | French: | TERMINAL D'INFORMATION PORTABLE, CAMERA NUMERIQUE POUR TERMINAL D'INFORMATION PORTABLE, ET SYSTEME DE TERMINAL D'INFORMATION PORTABLE A CAMERA NUMERIQUE | [2002/49] | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/49] | 05.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/20] | 29.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2009 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH10340517 ; | [A]US4556958 (UGON MICHEL [FR]) [A] 62,67 * the whole document *; | [A]US4680641 (NAKAZAWA TAMOTSU [JP]) [A] 62,67 * column 4, line 28 - line 37 *; | [A]US5134497 (KIM DONG-YOUNG [KR]) [A] 77,79,80,82* abstract *; | [XY]EP0704788 (AT & T CORP [US]) [X] 1 * column 5, line 17 - line 28 * [Y] 2,7,8,17; | [XA]EP0705037 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 50-55 * the whole document * [A] 25,62,67; | [A]US5675358 (BULLOCK GARLAND RAY [US], et al) [A] 77,79,80,82 * the whole document *; | [A]US5754227 (FUKUOKA HIROKI [JP]) [A] 62,67,77,79,80,82 * abstract *; | [A]EP0887991 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 77,79,80,82 * the whole document *; | [A]US5943603 (PARULSKI KENNETH A [US], et al) [A] 25,50 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9942952 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,7,17 * abstract *; | [XA]US5956048 (GASTON KERRY R [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 17; | [Y]US6026007 (JIGOUR ROBIN J [US], et al) [Y] 2,7,8,17 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1133185 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [E] 25-38,50-55 * column W * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990331), vol. 1999, no. 03, & JP10340517 A 19981222 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 25 * abstract * |