EP1274001 - INFORMATION RETRIEVAL/TRANSMISSION METHOD AND RECORDING MEDIUM RECORDING PROGRAM INSTRUCTING PROCEDURE FOR INFORMATION RETRIEVAL/TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.03.2006 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.04.2006 [2006/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nihon System Design, Inc. Aparight Building 6F, 7-15-1, Nishi-Shinjuku, Shinjuku-ku Tokoy 160-0023 / JP | [2004/19] |
Former [2003/02] | For all designated states Tenkey Rabbit System Co., Ltd. 302, Plum Garden, 3-1-3, Yoyogi, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0053 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyata, Yumiko 301 Suzuki-coop, 1-18-6, Suehiro, Chuo-ku Chiba Shi, Chiba 260 0843 / JP | 02 /
Aoki, Masahiro 205, Aruma Fussa, 689, Oaza Fussa Fussa-shi, Tokyo 197-0011 / JP | [2003/02] | Representative(s) | Möbus, Steffen Kayser & Möbus Patentanwälte Muenchstrasse 3 86482 Aystetten / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/02] | Möbus, Steffen Kayser & Möbus Patentanwälte Leienfelsstrasse 6 81243 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01908218.9 | 01.03.2001 | [2003/02] | WO2001JP01589 | Priority number, date | JP20000056480 | 01.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000056480 | WO2000JP01827 | 24.03.2000 Original published format: PCT/JP00/01827 | [2003/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0165351 | Date: | 07.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1274001 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/02, G06F3/023 | [2003/02] | CPC: |
G06F3/0489 (EP);
G06F3/04895 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FI, FR, GB, LI [2004/22] |
Former [2003/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSABRUF-/ÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN UND AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM, DAS PROGAMMBEFEHLSPROZEDUREN FÜR DAS ABRUFEN/ÜBERTRAGEN VON INFORMATIONEN AUFZEICHNET | [2003/02] | English: | INFORMATION RETRIEVAL/TRANSMISSION METHOD AND RECORDING MEDIUM RECORDING PROGRAM INSTRUCTING PROCEDURE FOR INFORMATION RETRIEVAL/TRANSMISSION | [2003/02] | French: | PROCEDE DE RECUPERATION/TRANSMISSION D'INFORMATIONS ET PROCEDE DE PROGRAMMATION DE PROGRAMME D'ENREGISTREMENT A SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT POUR RECUPERATION/TRANSMISSION D'INFORMATIONS | [2003/02] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2002 | Translation filed | 23.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2002 | Search fee paid | 23.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 23.08.2002 | Examination requested [2003/02] | 01.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/16] | 11.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH11327765 ; | [Y]JP3057915U ; | [Y]JPH0816292 |