EP1278349 - TRANSMISSION FORMAT JUDGING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2005 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.06.2005 [2005/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/04] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UGA, Shinsuke, MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2003/04] | Representative(s) | Sajda, Wolf E., et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/04] | Sajda, Wolf E., Dipl.-Phys., et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01908319.5 | 05.03.2001 | [2003/04] | WO2001JP01696 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02071724 | Date: | 12.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1278349 | Date: | 22.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04J13/00 | [2003/04] | CPC: |
H04L1/0072 (EP,US);
H04L1/0025 (EP,US);
H04L1/0039 (EP,US);
H04L1/0054 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/04] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEURTEILUNG DES ÜBERTRAGUNGSFORMATS | [2003/04] | English: | TRANSMISSION FORMAT JUDGING METHOD | [2003/04] | French: | PROCEDE D'ESTIMATION DU FORMAT DE TRANSMISSION | [2003/04] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2002 | Translation filed | 04.11.2002 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2002 | Search fee paid | 04.11.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/04] | 26.04.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH10303986 (AT & T CORP); | [A]JPH11225168 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [X]JP2001007883 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC INF TECH) |