EP1250628 - COMPACT THROUGH-THE-LENS DIGITAL CAMERA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.01.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Concord Camera Corp. 4000 Hollywood Boulevard, Suite 650 N Hollywood, FL 33021 / US | [2002/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bittner, Wilfried 9A, Block 6, Villa Esplanada 8 Nga Ying Chau Street Tsing Yi, N.T. Hong Kong / CN | 02 /
Buescher, Steve 10645 NW 7th Street Pembroke Pines, FL 33026 / US | 03 /
Westerweck, Lothar 1115 River Birch Street Hollywood, FL 33019 / US | 04 /
Raschke, Alex 1212 Camellia Lane Weston, FL 33326 / US | 05 /
Raschke, Klaus 460 Montclaire Drive Weston, FL 33326 / US | 06 /
Heglund, Ken 8090 Cleary Boulevard Plantation, FL 33324 / US | [2002/43] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/43] | W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Eastcheap House Central Approach Letchworth, Hertfordshire SG6 3DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 01908733.7 | 26.01.2001 | [2002/43] | WO2001US02874 | Priority number, date | US20000493355 | 28.01.2000 Original published format: US 493355 | [2002/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0155785 | Date: | 02.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1250628 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.08.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G03B17/00, G03B13/00, G03B13/02 | [2002/43] | CPC: |
H04N23/50 (EP,US);
H04N23/63 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMPAKTE T.T.L. DIGITALEKAMERA | [2002/43] | English: | COMPACT THROUGH-THE-LENS DIGITAL CAMERA | [2002/43] | French: | APPAREIL PHOTO NUMERIQUE COMPACT A TRAVERS L'OBJECTIF | [2002/43] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2002 | Search fee paid | 31.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 31.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/43] | 01.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/08] | 06.09.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2006 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH1039408 ; | [XAY]US3833758 (FERRARI L) [X] 1,36 * column 1, line 45 - line 68 * * column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 42; figure 4 * [A] 3-5,32,37 [Y] 2; | [XAY]US4949117 (VAN HEYNINGEN ROGER S [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5,36,37 * abstract * * column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 11 * * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 24; figures 1,2 * [A] 32 [Y] 2; | [XA]US5099265 (LEE SANG J [KR]) [X] 36,37 * abstract * * column 1, line 63 - line 68 * * column 2, line 11 - column 3, line 6; figures 2,3 * [A] 1,2,32; | [Y]US5815201 (HASHIMOTO TETSUYA [JP], et al) [Y] 2* abstract *; | US6041195 [ ] (HONDA TSUTOMU [JP], et al) [ ] * abstract * * column 12, line 31 - column 14, line 14; figure 4 * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 1998, no. 06, & JP10039408 A 19980213 (MINOLTA CO LTD) [X] 36,37 * abstract * [A] 1,2,32 | International search | [X]US5339126 (SHIMOSE TAKASHI [JP]) |