EP1257874 - SECOND-ORDER NONLINEAR OPTICS MATERIAL, THE DEVICES USING SAME AND METHODS OF PREPARING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.04.2007 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.05.2007 [2007/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lockheed Martin Corporation 6801 Rockledge Drive Bethesda, MD 20817 / US | [2002/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ERMER, Susan, P. 601 Sylvan Way Redwood City, CA 94062 / US | [2002/47] | Representative(s) | Hill, Justin John McDermott Will & Emery UK LLP 7 Bishopsgate London EC2N 3AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | Hill, Justin John McDermott Will & Emery 7 Bishopsgate London EC2N 3AR / GB | ||
Former [2002/47] | Israelsson, Stefan, et al Bjerkéns Patentbyra KB Östermalmsgatan 58 114 50 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 01908854.1 | 05.02.2001 | [2002/47] | WO2001US03718 | Priority number, date | US20000507943 | 22.02.2000 Original published format: US 507943 | [2002/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0163352 | Date: | 30.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1257874 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/361 | [2002/47] | CPC: |
G02F1/3615 (EP,US);
G02F1/3614 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR [2004/21] |
Former [2002/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NICHT LINEAR OPTISCHES MATERIAL ZWEITER ORDNUNG, VORRICHTUNGEN ZU DESSEN VERWENDUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2002/47] | English: | SECOND-ORDER NONLINEAR OPTICS MATERIAL, THE DEVICES USING SAME AND METHODS OF PREPARING | [2002/47] | French: | MATERIAU OPTIQUE NON LINEAIRE, DU SECOND ORDRE, DISPOSITIFS METTANT EN OEUVRE CE MATERIAU ET PROCEDES DE PREPARATION ASSOCIES | [2002/47] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 03.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/47] | 01.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/21] | 07.12.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | 06   M06   Not yet paid | 28.02.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0602654 (ENICHEM SPA [IT]) [A] 1,3-5,17,18,20,23 * example 25; claim - *; | [DA]US5834575 (HONDA YUTAKA [JP], et al) [DA] 1,23,34 * the whole document *; | [X] - POPOV S V ET AL, "SYNTHESIS, STRUCTURE, AND SPECTRA OF MEROCYANINES PREPARED FROM ANIONIC POLYMETHINE DYES", DYES AND PIGMENTS, ELSEVIER APPLIED SCIENCE PUBLISHERS. BARKING, GB, (1992), vol. 18, no. 2, ISSN 0143-7208, pages 151 - 162, XP000268100 [X] 1,3,7 * compound no.XII * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0143-7208(92)80014-E | [A] - HIMBERT G ET AL, "AMINOETHINYLIERUNG, V UMSETZUNG STANNYLIERTER INAMINE MIT (CHLORMETHYLEN)- MALONSAEUREDERIVATEN AMINOETHYNYLATION, V - REACTION OF STANNYLATED YNAMINES WITH (CHLOROMETHYLENE)MALONIC ACID DERIVATIVES", LIEBIGS ANNALEN DER CHEMIE, VERLAG CHEMIE GMBH. WEINHEIM, DE, (1985), no. 11, ISSN 0170-2041, pages 2206 - 2216, XP001009936 [A] 1,3,7 * compound no. 15 * |