EP1257773 - HEAT EXCHANGE PIPE WITH EXTRUDED FINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FI | published on 17.03.2010 [2010/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amerifab, Inc. 2075 South Belmont Avenue Indianapolis, IN 46221 / US | [2002/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KINCHELOE, David, P. 4551 Silver Hill Drive Greenwood, IN 46142 / US | 02 /
MANASEK, Richard, J. 3346 Delta Drive Greenwood, IN 46142 / US | [2002/47] | Representative(s) | Midgley, Jonathan Lee, et al Scott & York Intellectual Property Ltd 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/50] | Midgley, Jonathan Lee, et al Scott & York Intellectual Property Limited 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans, Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB | ||
Former [2006/49] | Midgley, Jonathan Lee, et al Marks & Clerk, 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans, Herts AL1 3AW / GB | ||
Former [2006/42] | Midgley, Jonathan Lee Marks & Clerk, 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans, Herts AL1 3AW / GB | ||
Former [2006/40] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Patentanwälte P.O. Box 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2005/49] | Midgley, Jonathan Lee, et al Marks & Clerk, 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans, Herts AL1 3AW / GB | ||
Former [2003/47] | Midgley, Jonathan Lee, et al Marks & Clerk 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields GB-London WC2A 3LS / GB | ||
Former [2002/47] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler, Postfach 71 08 67 81458 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01909161.0 | 13.02.2001 | [2002/47] | WO2001US04530 | Priority number, date | US20000184147P | 22.02.2000 Original published format: US 184147 P | US20000697272 | 26.10.2000 Original published format: US 697272 | [2002/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0163193 | Date: | 30.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1257773 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1257773 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.08.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F27D1/12 | [2002/47] | CPC: |
F27D1/12 (EP,US);
F28D7/0041 (EP,US);
F28F1/22 (EP,US);
F27D2009/0029 (EP,US);
F27D2009/0051 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄRMETAUSCHROHR MIT RIPPEN | [2002/47] | English: | HEAT EXCHANGE PIPE WITH EXTRUDED FINS | [2002/47] | French: | TUBE ECHANGEUR THERMIQUE A AILETTES EXTRUDEES | [2002/47] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2002 | Search fee paid | 22.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/47] | 12.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M10) | 24.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 26.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.03.2007 | 23.03.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 27.03.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 08.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/43] | Request for further processing for: | 26.07.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 25.07.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.08.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.11.2007 | FI | 14.11.2007 | IE | 13.02.2008 | MC | 28.02.2008 | [2010/11] |
Former [2009/33] | CY | 14.11.2007 | |
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | IE | 13.02.2008 | |
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | MC | 28.02.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1774150 (BRADLEY MURRAY JOSEPH, et al) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US1844407 (BRADLEY MURRAY JOSEPH, et al) [A] 1,5-10* figure -; claim - *; | [A]US2162083 (HIGHAM WILLIAM W, et al) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US3294162 (LOEHLEIN HAROLD J, et al) [A] 2 * figure -; claim - *; | [YA]FR2336648 (SOFRESID [FR]) [Y] 1 * figure -; claim - * * figures 3,2 * [A] 5-9; | [Y]US4135575 (GERSCH KARL H) [Y] 1 * figures 2,3; claim - *; | [A]US5787109 (STENKVIST SVEN-EINAR [CH]) [A] 1,12 * figure -; claim - *; | [AP]US6035928 (RUPPEL WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [AP] 2 * figure -; claim - * | International search | [A]US4206312 (KUHLMANN HERBERT [DE]); | [A]US4351055 (BICK KLAUS, et al); | [X]US4458351 (RICHARDS RAYMOND E [US]); | [X]US4559011 (GRITSUK LEV D [SU], et al) |