EP1263635 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINATION OF A WHEEL BRAKE PARAMETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.2010 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2009/42] |
Former [2002/50] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RADER, Thomas Gartenstrasse 43/1 72764 Reutlingen / DE | 02 /
GLASSTETTER, Thomas Bremichstr. 45 75038 Oberderingen / DE | [2002/50] | Application number, filing date | 01909544.7 | 31.01.2001 | [2002/50] | WO2001DE00357 | Priority number, date | DE2000111270 | 08.03.2000 Original published format: DE 10011270 | [2002/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0166393 | Date: | 13.09.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1263635 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1263635 | Date: | 14.10.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/00 | [2002/50] | CPC: |
B60T8/172 (EP,US);
B60T8/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/21] |
Former [2002/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERMITTLUNG EINES KENNWERTES EINER RADBREMSE | [2002/50] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINATION OF A WHEEL BRAKE PARAMETER | [2002/50] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE DETERMINATION DE LA VALEUR CARACTERISTIQUE D'UN FREIN DE ROUE | [2002/50] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.10.2002 | Examination requested [2002/50] | 21.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]DE3909588 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,7,8,10 * Das ganze Dokument * [A] 3,4,6,9; | [A]US5312170 (ERBAN ANDREAS [DE], et al) [A] 1,10* column 3, line 35 - line 54 * | by applicant | DE19648936 |