EP1261813 - AIR SPRING WITH TWO PART HOUSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 07.09.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Aktiengesellschaft Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [2002/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OLDENETTEL, Holger Altes Dorf 6 D 30900 Resse / DE | [2002/49] | Application number, filing date | 01909735.1 | 10.02.2001 | [2002/49] | WO2001EP01477 | Priority number, date | DE20001009912 | 01.03.2000 Original published format: DE 10009912 | [2002/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0165139 | Date: | 07.09.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1261813 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1261813 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/40] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1261813 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F16F9/084, B60G15/14 | [2002/49] | CPC: |
B60G15/12 (EP,US);
F16F9/084 (EP,US);
B60G2204/126 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/49] | Title | German: | LUFTFEDER MIT ZWEITEILIGEM GEHÄUSE | [2002/49] | English: | AIR SPRING WITH TWO PART HOUSING | [2002/49] | French: | AMORTISSEUR PNEUMATIQUE COMPORTANT UN CARTER EN DEUX PARTIES | [2002/49] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 11.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.07.2006
ADMISSIBLE Carl Freudenberg KG Patente und Marken 69465 Weinheim / DE | [2006/34] | 10.08.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.08.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.02.2007 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 14.02.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.03.2007 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 14.03.2007 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 04.07.2007 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 13.07.2007 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 05.10.2005 | FI | 05.10.2005 | GB | 05.10.2005 | IE | 05.10.2005 | IT | 05.10.2005 | NL | 05.10.2005 | TR | 05.10.2005 | DK | 05.01.2006 | GR | 05.01.2006 | SE | 05.01.2006 | ES | 16.01.2006 | AT | 10.02.2006 | BE | 28.02.2006 | CH | 28.02.2006 | LI | 28.02.2006 | LU | 28.02.2006 | MC | 28.02.2006 | PT | 06.03.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/37] | FI | 05.10.2005 | |
GB | 05.10.2005 | ||
IE | 05.10.2005 | ||
IT | 05.10.2005 | ||
NL | 05.10.2005 | ||
TR | 05.10.2005 | ||
DK | 05.01.2006 | ||
GR | 05.01.2006 | ||
SE | 05.01.2006 | ||
ES | 16.01.2006 | ||
AT | 10.02.2006 | ||
BE | 28.02.2006 | ||
CH | 28.02.2006 | ||
LI | 28.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | FI | 05.10.2005 | |
GB | 05.10.2005 | ||
IE | 05.10.2005 | ||
IT | 05.10.2005 | ||
NL | 05.10.2005 | ||
DK | 05.01.2006 | ||
GR | 05.01.2006 | ||
SE | 05.01.2006 | ||
ES | 16.01.2006 | ||
AT | 10.02.2006 | ||
BE | 28.02.2006 | ||
CH | 28.02.2006 | ||
LI | 28.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | FI | 05.10.2005 | |
GB | 05.10.2005 | ||
IE | 05.10.2005 | ||
NL | 05.10.2005 | ||
DK | 05.01.2006 | ||
GR | 05.01.2006 | ||
SE | 05.01.2006 | ||
ES | 16.01.2006 | ||
AT | 10.02.2006 | ||
BE | 28.02.2006 | ||
CH | 28.02.2006 | ||
LI | 28.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | FI | 05.10.2005 | |
GB | 05.10.2005 | ||
IE | 05.10.2005 | ||
NL | 05.10.2005 | ||
DK | 05.01.2006 | ||
GR | 05.01.2006 | ||
SE | 05.01.2006 | ||
ES | 16.01.2006 | ||
BE | 28.02.2006 | ||
CH | 28.02.2006 | ||
LI | 28.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | FI | 05.10.2005 | |
GB | 05.10.2005 | ||
IE | 05.10.2005 | ||
NL | 05.10.2005 | ||
DK | 05.01.2006 | ||
GR | 05.01.2006 | ||
SE | 05.01.2006 | ||
ES | 16.01.2006 | ||
CH | 28.02.2006 | ||
LI | 28.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | FI | 05.10.2005 | |
IE | 05.10.2005 | ||
NL | 05.10.2005 | ||
DK | 05.01.2006 | ||
GR | 05.01.2006 | ||
SE | 05.01.2006 | ||
ES | 16.01.2006 | ||
CH | 28.02.2006 | ||
LI | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/44] | FI | 05.10.2005 | |
IE | 05.10.2005 | ||
NL | 05.10.2005 | ||
DK | 05.01.2006 | ||
GR | 05.01.2006 | ||
SE | 05.01.2006 | ||
ES | 16.01.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | FI | 05.10.2005 | |
IE | 05.10.2005 | ||
NL | 05.10.2005 | ||
DK | 05.01.2006 | ||
GR | 05.01.2006 | ||
SE | 05.01.2006 | ||
ES | 16.01.2006 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | FI | 05.10.2005 | |
NL | 05.10.2005 | ||
DK | 05.01.2006 | ||
GR | 05.01.2006 | ||
SE | 05.01.2006 | ||
ES | 16.01.2006 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | FI | 05.10.2005 | |
NL | 05.10.2005 | ||
DK | 05.01.2006 | ||
SE | 05.01.2006 | ||
ES | 16.01.2006 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | FI | 05.10.2005 | |
NL | 05.10.2005 | ||
SE | 05.01.2006 | ||
ES | 16.01.2006 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 05.10.2005 | |
NL | 05.10.2005 | ||
SE | 05.01.2006 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 05.10.2005 | |
NL | 05.10.2005 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 05.10.2005 | |
NL | 05.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | NL | 05.10.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS60121337 ; | [A]FR2574717 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * figure . *; | [X]DE3726923 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,7 * the whole document *; | [X]JPH06228538 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD) [X] 1,2,5,7 * figure - *; | [A]US5667203 (ROEMER MATTHIAS [DE]) [A] 1 * figure - * * column 1, line 50 - line 53 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851107), vol. 009, no. 279, Database accession no. (M - 427), & JP60121337 A 19850628 (BRIDGESTONE KK) [A] * abstract * | Examination | JPS6056612 | JPH03244844 | by applicant | EP0253261 |