EP1181522 - CONTROL METHOD FOR A BI-AXIAL WHEEL TEST BENCH FOR SIMULATING DRIVING STRESSES AND A BI-AXIAL WHEEL TEST BENCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.11.2004 [2004/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hayes Lemmerz Holding GmbH Ladestrasse 53639 Königswinter / DE | [2002/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHWENDEMANN, Heinz Zingsheimstrasse 32 53225 Bonn / DE | [2002/09] | Representative(s) | Althaus, Arndt, et al Patentanwälte Buschhoff Hennicke Althaus Postfach 19 04 08 50501 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/09] | Althaus, Arndt, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte, Buschhoff Hennicke Vollbach, Postfach 19 04 08 50501 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 01909818.5 | 03.03.2001 | [2002/09] | WO2001EP02437 | Priority number, date | DE2000113965 | 21.03.2000 Original published format: DE 10013965 | [2002/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0171307 | Date: | 27.09.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1181522 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1181522 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G01M17/02 | [2002/09] | CPC: |
G01M17/022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/47] |
Former [2002/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REGELVERFAHREN FÜR EINEN ZWEIAXIALEN RÄDERPRÜFSTAND ZUR SIMULATION VON FAHRBELASTUNGEN UND ZWEIAXIALER RÄDERPRÜFSTAND | [2002/09] | English: | CONTROL METHOD FOR A BI-AXIAL WHEEL TEST BENCH FOR SIMULATING DRIVING STRESSES AND A BI-AXIAL WHEEL TEST BENCH | [2002/09] | French: | PROCEDE DE REGLAGE POUR UN BANC D'ESSAI BIAXIAL DE ROUES PERMETTANT LA SIMULATION DES CHARGES DE MOUVEMENT ET BANC D'ESSAI DE ROUES BIAXIAL | [2003/40] |
Former [2002/09] | PROCEDE DE REGULATION POUR UN BANC D'ESSAI DE ROUES BIAXIAL SERVANT A SIMULER DES CHARGES DE MARCHE ET BANC D'ESSAI DE ROUES BIAXIAL | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/09] | 28.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0927879 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1-9 * figure 2 *; | [A]EP0928961 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1-9 * page 8 *; | [A]EP0507058 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1-9 * column 7, line 10 - column 7, line 51; figure 3 * |