EP1374109 - ELECTRONIC SETTLEMENT METHOD USING CREDIT CARD WITH CARDHOLDERS SUBSIDIARY CREDIT ACCOUNTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.01.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.03.2006 [2006/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bioherb Co. Ltd. 28 Yungun-dong, Jongro-ku Seoul 110-460 / KR | [2004/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YI, Yeong Deug Hurs Apt. Na-501 251-12, Todang-dong Dukyang-ku Goyang City Kyungki-do 412-210 / KR | 02 /
CHANG, II Moo II-gun Villa 2-101 793-32 Yorksam-dong Kangnam-ku Seoul 135-081 / KR | [2004/03] |
Former [2004/01] | 01 /
YI, Yeong Deug Hurs Apt. Na-501 251-12, Todang-dong Dukyang-ku Goyang City Kyungki-do 412-210 / KR | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01910146.8 | 23.02.2001 | [2004/01] | WO2001KR00273 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02069218 | Date: | 06.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1374109 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.09.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60, G07F19/00 | [2004/38] | CPC: |
G06Q20/04 (EP);
G06Q20/385 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2004/01] | G06F17/60 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHES BEGLEICHUNGSVERFAHREN DURCH VERWENDUNG EINER KREDITKARTE MIT ZWEITRANGIGEN KREDITKONTEN DES KARTENHALTERS | [2004/01] | English: | ELECTRONIC SETTLEMENT METHOD USING CREDIT CARD WITH CARDHOLDERS SUBSIDIARY CREDIT ACCOUNTS | [2004/01] | French: | PROCEDE DE REGLEMENT ELECTRONIQUE AU MOYEN D'UNE CARTE DE CREDIT A COMPTES DE CREDIT SUBSIDIAIRES DE PORTEUR DE CARTE | [2004/01] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2003 | Search fee paid | 23.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR | 23.09.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 01.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/10] | 10.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5953710 (FLEMING STEPHEN S [US]) [A] 1-3 * column 3, line 5 - column 4, line 10 *; | [X]WO0049586 (ORBIS PATENTS LIMITED [IE], et al) [X] 1-3 * page 13, line 18 - page 15, line 13; figure 1 *; | [A]US6163771 (WALKER JAY S [US], et al) [A] 1-3* abstract * | International search | [Y]KR20000072822 ; | [Y]KR20010000616 ; | [A]US5963924 ; | [A]US6095416 ; | [A]KR20010000518 ; | [A]KR20000072682 |