EP1275068 - SYSTEM FOR FACILITATING TRADE PROCESSING AND TRADE MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.08.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Refusal of application | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OMGEO LLC 55 Water Street New York New York 10041 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/12] | For all designated states Omgeo LLC 55 Water Street New York, New York 10041 / US | ||
Former [2003/03] | For all designated states Thomson Information Services, Inc. 22 Thomson Place Boston, MA 02210 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EDELSTEIN, P. Howard 33Sleeper Street Boston, MA 02210 / US | 02 /
WALSH, Christopher, J. 51 Round Hill Road Kingston, MA 02364 / US | 03 /
SMITH, Christopher G. Ferndown, 35 Oak Hill Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1NS / GB | 04 /
FOSTER, Gary, S. 28 Eliot Road Arlington, MA 02474 / US | 05 /
TIERNEY, Peter, J. 14 Round Hill Road Kingston, MA 02364 / US | [2003/10] |
Former [2003/03] | 01 /
EDELSTEIN, P., Howard 45 Sheffield Road Newton, MA 02460 / US | ||
02 /
WALSH, Christopher, J. 51 Round Hill Road Kingston, MA 02364 / US | |||
03 /
SMITH, Christopher G. Ferndown, 35 Oak Hill Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1NS / GB | |||
04 /
FOSTER, Gary, S. 28 Eliot Road Arlington, MA 02474 / US | |||
05 /
TIERNEY, Peter, J. 14 Round Hill Road Kingston, MA 02364 / US | Representative(s) | Grundmann, Dirk Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Yale-Allee 26 42329 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/03] | Grundmann, Dirk, Dr. c/o Rieder & Partner, Corneliusstrasse 45 42329 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 01910720.0 | 15.02.2001 | [2003/03] | WO2001US04826 | Priority number, date | US20000504803 | 16.02.2000 Original published format: US 504803 | [2003/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0161602 | Date: | 23.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1275068 | Date: | 15.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.08.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2003/03] | CPC: |
G06Q10/00 (EP,US);
G06Q20/10 (EP,US);
G06Q20/102 (EP,US);
G06Q20/105 (EP,US);
G06Q20/108 (EP,US);
G06Q20/40 (EP,US);
G06Q30/04 (EP,US);
G06Q40/00 (EP,US);
G06Q40/03 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR ERLEICHTERUNG DER HANDELSVERARBEITUNG UND DES HANDELSMANAGEMENTS | [2003/03] | English: | SYSTEM FOR FACILITATING TRADE PROCESSING AND TRADE MANAGEMENT | [2003/03] | French: | SYSTEME PERMETTANT DE PERFECTIONNER LES OPERATIONS ET LA GESTION COMMERCIALES | [2003/03] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.2002 | Search fee paid | 16.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.09.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2002 | Examination requested [2003/03] | 02.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/36] | 21.04.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 01.05.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search | International search | [Y]US4774663 (MUSMANNO THOMAS E [US], et al); | [Y]US4823265 (NELSON GEORGE E [US]); | [Y]US5262942 (EARLE DENNIS M [US]); | [X]US5285383 (LINDSEY JAMES D [US], et al); | [Y]US5497317 (HAWKINS JOHN G [US], et al) |